Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:18-cv-10024
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Apr 30, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 4:38 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Meredith Shachoy
Represented By
Gregory J. Aceto
Aceto, Bonner & Prager, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karen Ballinger
Represented By
Lisa Brodeur-McGan
Brodeur-Mcgan, P.C.
contact info
Gareth W. Notis
Morrison, Mahoney, & Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Meredith Shachoy
Represented By
Gregory J. Aceto
Aceto, Bonner & Prager, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Ballinger
Represented By
Lisa Brodeur-McGan
Brodeur-Mcgan, P.C.
contact info
Gareth W. Notis
Morrison, Mahoney, & Miller LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 27, 2018
21 21 misc Case file sent Fri 04/27 11:35 AM
Case file sent to Plymouth County Superior Court. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Fri 04/27 10:18 AM
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
19 19 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 04/27 10:10 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2018 as Suffolk Law School re4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Karen Ballinger,7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Meredith Shachoy. After hearing from counsel, the Court enters an order granting7 Motion to Remand to State Court and taking no action re4 Motion to Dismiss. The case is ordered remanded to Plymouth Superior Court. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Notis and Brodeur-McGan for Ballinger, Attorney Aceto for Shachoy) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
18 18 1 pgs discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Tue 02/13 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Plaintiff . (Brodeur-McGan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
17 17 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Mon 02/12 11:33 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing reset for 3/29/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Suffolk Law School, 120 Tremont Street, 4th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
16 16 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 02/01 2:29 PM
Opposition re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Opposition of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Motion to Remand filed by Karen Ballinger.(Notis, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit Verified Complaint,
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit Defendant's Answer and Counterclaims
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
15 15 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 01/31 5:55 PM
Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Meredith Shachoy.(Aceto, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Decision: Defendant's Motion to Suppress
Monday, January 29, 2018
14 14 misc Sealed Document Mon 01/29 4:15 PM
STATE COURT RECORD.(Filed Under Seal - Medical Records) (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/29 8:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . Responses due by 2/1/2018. Replies due by 2/5/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 3/8/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This motion hearing will take place at Suffolk Law School, 120 Tremont Street, 4th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 01/29 8:43 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Joint Motion to Continue Motion Hearing and to Amend Briefing Schedule. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
11 11 motion Continue Wed 01/24 10:26 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing and Amend Briefing Schedule by Meredith Shachoy.(Aceto, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
10 10 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 01/23 11:32 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Denied. Both the motion to remand and the motion to dismiss will be considered on February 9th re9 Motion to Stay (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
9 9 motion Stay Mon 01/22 5:46 PM
MOTION to Stay re4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Meredith Shachoy.(Aceto, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
8 8 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Tue 01/16 10:44 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Boston University Law School, 765 Commonwealth Avenue, 6th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2018
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Mon 01/15 3:50 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Meredith Shachoy, Meredith Shachoy.(Aceto, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
6 6 notice Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1 Mon 01/08 10:02 AM
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) Local Rule 7.1 Certificate by Gareth W. Notis on behalf of Karen Ballinger. (Notis, Gareth)
Related: [-]
5 5 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 01/08 10:00 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Karen Ballinger.(Notis, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's Answer and Counterclaim
4 4 motion Dismiss Mon 01/08 9:58 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendant-in-Counterclaim, Karen Ballinger, to Dismiss Counterclaim Pursuant to FedR.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Karen Ballinger.(Notis, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Fri 01/05 2:08 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (adminn, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 01/05 2:08 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 01/05 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Karen Ballinger ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6951249 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Notis, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Exhibit Verified Complaint and Answer and Counterclaim of Meredith Shachoy,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet