Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:18-cv-00011
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Nov 09, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 4:44 AM EDT
defendant
Parkway Tropics, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Curran Waslawski
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
Allan S. Rubin
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
defendant
Edward Sayfie
an individual, jointly and severally 814 Lake Michigan Dr. NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49504
Represented By
Daniel Curran Waslawski
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
Allan S. Rubin
Jackson Lewis P.C. (southfield)
contact info
plaintiff
Ashley Cavazos
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 5726 Ridgebrook Ave.
Kentwood, MI 49508
Represented By
Robert Anthony Alvarez
Avanti Law Group PLLC
contact info
Agustin Henriquez, Jr.
Avanti Law Group PLLC
contact info
Victoria Lynn Smalley
Avanti Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 09, 2018
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 11/09 11:06 AM
ORDER granting24 motion for settlement approval; this action is dismissed with prejudice based on the approved settlement; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
25 25 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Tue 11/06 3:32 PM
BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION for settlement 24 filed by Ashley Cavazos (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
24 24 motion Settlement Tue 11/06 3:31 PM
JOINT MOTION for settlement by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos; (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 05/29 2:27 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part11 motion to dismiss; this matter is stayed pending completion of arbitration; the parties shall file a status report with the Court every 90 days, and upon completion of the arbitration process ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/29 11:35 AM
MINUTES of motion hearing re11 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/25 7:15 PM
NOTICE re19 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
20 20 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Tue 05/22 2:35 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Waslawski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/21 4:44 PM
NOTICE re11 Supplemental Authority by defendants Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie (Waslawski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 10, 2018
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Thu 05/10 5:00 PM
ORDER granting16 motion to adjourn Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is reset to 5/29/2018 at 10:00 AM ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Thu 05/10 11:35 AM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to adjourn Rule 16 Scheduling Conference 16 filed by Ashley Cavazos (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Adjourn Thu 05/10 11:33 AM
MOTION to adjourn Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos; (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/30 2:12 PM
REPLY to response to motion11 filed by Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie (Waslawski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Monday, April 16, 2018
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/16 5:57 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration 11 filed by Ashley Cavazos (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
13 13 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Wed 03/21 9:33 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 5/15/2018 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
12 12 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/20 10:14 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parkway Tropics, Inc. (Rubin, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 03/19 3:14 PM
MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by defendants Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie; (Waslawski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - NEELA,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Unpublished Cases
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 03/19 3:08 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Curran Waslawski on behalf of defendants Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie (Waslawski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 03/19 3:09 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan S. Rubin on behalf of defendants Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie (Rubin, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Proposed Order Mon 03/12 8:21 AM
ORDER granting8 motion to withdraw as attorney; granting PROPOSED ORDER9 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
9 9 motion Proposed Order Thu 03/08 10:47 PM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos (Smalley, Victoria)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/08 10:46 PM
MOTION to withdraw as attorney by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos; (Smalley, Victoria)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 03/08 3:21 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Agustin Henriquez, Jr on behalf of plaintiff Ashley Cavazos (Henriquez, Agustin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 02/06 11:03 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victoria Lynn Smalley on behalf of plaintiff Ashley Cavazos (Smalley, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/19 4:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ashley Cavazos as to Parkway Tropics, Inc. waiver sent on 1/19/2018, answer due 3/20/2018; Edward Sayfie waiver sent on 1/19/2018, answer due 3/20/2018 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 11:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Parkway Tropics, Inc., Edward Sayfie (ems)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 01/10 10:59 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Ashley Cavazos in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4026725 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/09 3:07 PM
ORDER denying2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filing fee to be submitted by 2/6/2018 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
4 4 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Fri 01/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Fri 01/05 12:30 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees Fri 01/05 12:29 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 12:29 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Parkway Tropics Inc., Edward Sayfie filed by Ashley Cavazos (Alvarez, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility IFP Decision Pending/Complaint Received Fri 01/05 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (ns)
Related: [-]