Minnesota District Court
Judge:Paul A Magnuson
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:18-cv-00043
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Oct 22, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 4:05 AM CDT
Defendant
Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
Represented By
Barbara P Berens
Berens & Miller, PA
contact info
Amanda Ann Sonneborn
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael Busey
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Berens & Miller, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Marisha Daley
Represented By
Brandon Operana
Operana Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 22, 2018
25 25 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 10/22 1:24 PM
JUDGMENT(MMP) Modified text on 10/22/2018 (MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 10/22 11:25 AM
ORDER: Based on the parties' Stipulation22 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERD that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs, disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 10/22/2018. (LLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
23 23 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 10/18 1:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re22 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Busey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/18 1:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Jointly Signed by Marisha Daley. (Busey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice to Attorney Thu 10/18 11:15 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE to Attorneys: The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a settlement. If the parties are unable to file a Stipulation of Dismissal within 30 days, counsel shall inform the Court by letter of the current status of the settlement and the likely timeframe needed for completing the settlement papers and filing a Stipulation of Dismissal. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
20 20 notice Notice to Attorney Tue 10/09 2:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Resetting of Trial Ready date: Ready for trial due by May 1, 2019. (JEP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
19 19 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 07/18 11:55 AM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/18/2018. (KMH)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 07/18 11:53 AM
ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED - WILL REFILE - ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/18/2018. (KMH) Modified text on 7/18/2018 (MMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Fri 07/13 4:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/10/2018. Informal telephone conference with counsel. Parties are exchanging settlement proposals. The Court will schedule a formal settlement conference for October, 2018. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
16 16 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/28 10:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Ann Sonneborn for Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2018. (MMG)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/28 10:34 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Michael Busey for Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2018. (MMG)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 06/28 12:30 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda A. Sonneborn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6197064 filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Berens, Barbara)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 06/28 12:29 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. Busey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6197057 filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Berens, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/24 2:45 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/10/2018 at 08:30 AM with Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 9/1/2018. Motions (disp) due by 12/1/2018. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/24/2018. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
11 11 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 04/20 12:24 PM
(Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE OF CANCELING the April 24, 2018 Pretrial Conference. The Court will issue a Pretrial Scheduling Order based upon the parties' written submission Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/20/2018. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
10 10 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Mon 04/16 9:56 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Christopher M. Busey as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (AKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 04/13 3:29 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Marisha Daley. Jointly Signed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
8 8 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 03/20 9:57 AM
ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Set for 4/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/20/2018. (KMH) (LPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/20/2018) Consent Form
notice Notice of Docketing Correction Tue 03/20 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for8 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines. The Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge form was attached and regenerated. (LPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/19 3:07 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
6 6 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 03/06 12:23 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Prudential Financial, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Berens, Barbara)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/06 12:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Complaint filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Berens, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/23 3:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Marisha Daley. Prudential Insurance Company of America, The waiver sent on 1/5/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/05 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (lmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 01/05 2:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-43 (PAM/DTS). (lmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/05 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America, The (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-5895089) filed by Marisha Daley. Filer requests summons issued..(Operana, Brandon) Modified text on 1/5/2018 (lmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet