Original Case: 4:14-cv-00785

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-01040
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Jun 11, 2019
Last checked: Thursday Jun 13, 2019 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Kilgore, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Alvin Brooks, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Angela Wasson-Hunt, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Rader, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sylvester James, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
David Kenner, Member Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Darryl Forte, Chief of Police
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Selvir Abidovic, Police Officer, # 5569
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Christopher Krueger, Police Officer, # 5476
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Christopher Taylor, Police Officer, # 5353
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Keller, Police Officer, # 5576
Represented By
Diane Peters
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Tina Smith, individually, and a Natural Mother and Lawful Heir of Raymond A. Smith, Jr., deceased
Represented By
Wainsworth Anderson
ANDERSON LAW GROUP
contact info

GPO Jun 11 2019
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Lavenski R. Smith, Duane Benton and David R. Stras
AUTHORING JUDGE:Duane Benton (PUBLISHED) [4796160] [18-1040]

Docket last updated: 06/13/2019 3:32 AM CDT
Friday, January 05, 2018
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4617280] 18-1040 (BNS)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and orders dated 11/27/17 and 11/30/17. [4617287] 18-1040 (BNS)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 02/14/2018. Appendix due 02/26/2018. BRIEF APPELLANT, Tina Smith due 02/26/2018
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4617289] 18-1040 (BNS)
Related: [-]