Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-50549

Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 5:18-ap-05003
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2018
Terminated:Aug 27, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark Sedlak
2611 Boston Post Road
Darien, CT 06820
Represented By
Mark Sedlak
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Sedlak
2611 Boston Post Road
Darien, CT 06820
Represented By
Danielle Sedlak
contact info
Plaintiff
Swim Seventy, LLC
8 Willard Road
Norwalk, CT 06851
Represented By
Douglas S. Skalka
Neubert, Pepe, And Monteith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
33 33 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/27 4:07 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:18-ap-5003 Closed . (Whitmore, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/27 11:48 AM
Voluntary Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal Between Plaintiff and Defendants with Prejudice Filed by Kara S. Rescia on behalf of Danielle Sedlak, Mark Sedlak, Swim Seventy, LLC Defendants, Plaintiff Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLCscia, Kara
Saturday, July 20, 2019
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/21 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 07/20/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Motion to Compromise
Thursday, July 18, 2019
30 30 order Compromise Thu 07/18 10:40 AM
Order On Motion To Compromise And For Approval Of Settlement Agreement. Related [+] . (Whitmore, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
29 29 court Hearing Held Wed 07/17 10:23 AM
Hearing Held. Order Granting authority to enter into a settlement agreement to enter for the reasons stated on the record. Related [+] 19 Motion to Compromise filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
28 28 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 07/16 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/16/2019 10:37:45 AM ]. File Size [ 2318 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:26 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 26, 2019
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Mon 05/27 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/26/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Final Hearing
Saturday, May 25, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Reopen Adversary
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 05/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Hearing
Friday, May 24, 2019
24 24 court Notice of Final Hearing Fri 05/24 2:21 PM
Notice of Final Hearing Issued Related [+] 19 Motion to Compromise filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). Hearing to be held on 7/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 7/9/2019. (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Fri 05/24 2:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE AND SETTING A DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH D. CONN. BANKR. L. R. 9019-1(a)(2). The Request for Continuance of Initial Hearing, ECF No.22 , is GRANTED . Trustee Kara Rescia must comply with D. Conn. Bankr. L. R. 9019-1(a)(2) on or before June 7, 2019. A Notice of Final Hearing will be issued on ECF No.19 . Related [+] 22 Request filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC.) Signed by Chief Judge Julie A. Manning on May 24, 2019. (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
22 22 misc Request Thu 05/23 2:17 PM
Request -Request for Continuance of Initial Hearing Only (Exceptions to Contested Matter Procedure) Filed by Kara S. Rescia on behalf of Swim Seventy, LLC Plaintiff . Related [+]
Related: [-] scia, Kara
21 21 order Reopen Adversary Thu 05/23 11:31 AM
Order Re: Trustee's Motion To Vacate Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] . (Whitmore, Lorenzo)
Related: [-] 18
20 20 court Notice of Hearing Thu 05/23 10:29 AM
Notice of Hearing Issued Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 6/11/2019. (Pettway, Christina)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Compromise filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC
Monday, May 20, 2019
19 19 motion Compromise Mon 05/20 5:17 PM
Motion to Compromise Adversary Proceeding with Mark Sedlak and Danielle Sedlak and for Approval of Settlement Agreement with Ex "A" Settlement Agreement, Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service Filed by Kara S. Rescia on behalf of Swim Seventy, LLC, Plaintiff . Response(s) due by 06/10/2019. Related [+]
Related: [-] scia, Kara
18 18 motion Reopen Adversary Mon 05/20 5:09 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding with Proposed Order and Certificate of Service . Filed by Kara S. Rescia on behalf of Swim Seventy, LLC, Plaintiff . Response(s) due by 06/10/2019. Related [+]
Related: [-] scia, Kara
Friday, March 01, 2019
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/01 3:12 PM
Adversary Proceeding 5:18-ap-5003 Closed . (Staton, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 16, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/17 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, February 14, 2019
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/14 11:38 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] 14 Local Rule 7041 Letter.) (Staton, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/26 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Local Rule 7041 Letter
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
14 14 court Local Rule 7041 Letter Wed 01/23 3:58 PM
Local Rule 7041 Letter . Response(s) due by 2/13/2019. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance Thu 05/17 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Kristin B. Mayhew on behalf of Danielle Sedlak, Mark Sedlak Defendants, . (Mayhew, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
12 12 court Virtual Order Served Thu 05/03 11:47 AM
Service made on Mark and Danielle Sedlak at 2611 Boston Post Road, Darien, CT 06820 via first class mail Related [+] 11 Order). (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Thu 05/03 11:32 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMMUNICATE WITH PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL (ECF No. 10). On January 9, 2018, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 542, the Debtor commenced an Adversary Proceeding against Defendants Mark Sedlak and Danielle Sedlak (collectively, the "Defendants"), seeking a turnover of certain funds that allegedly belong to the Debtor's estate. On March 13, 2018, a default was entered against the Defendants. A pretrial conference was held on March 27, 2018. At the pretrial conference, Defendant Mark Sedlak appeared and requested additional time to evaluate the Debtor's claim asserted against the Defendants and the Defendants' need to secure legal counsel. The Court instructed Defendant Mark Sedlak that if the Defendants decide to secure legal counsel, they must secure legal counsel by April 27, 2018. The Court also instructed the Debtor not to file a motion for default judgment until after April 27, 2018. On April 27, 2018, Defendant Sedlak filed a letter which the Court construes as a motion to extend time to communicate with the Debtor's counsel (the "Motion", ECF No. 10 ). In the Motion, Defendant Sedlak is seeking additional time to discuss potential resolution of the Adversary Proceeding and to evaluate the Defendants' need to secure legal counsel. After careful review of the Motion, it is hereby ORDERED : The Motion is GRANTED . If any of the Defendants decides to secure legal counsel, the Defendants must secure legal counsel by May 18, 2018; and it is further ORDERED : The Debtor shall not file a motion for default judgment until after May 18, 2018; and it is further ORDERED : On or before at 5:00 p.m. on May 3, 2018, the Clerk's Office shall serve this Order on the Defendants via first class mail to 2611 Boston Post Road, Darien, CT 06820. Signed by Chief Judge Julie A. Manning on May 3, 2018. (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Fri 04/27 3:14 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Communicate with Plaintiff's counsel (filed as a letter) Filed by Mark Sedlak, Defendant . Response(s) due by 5/18/2018. (Esposito, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
9 9 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 03/27 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/27/2018 11:46:31 AM ]. File Size [ 3466 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:38 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
8 8 audio Digital Audio Recording Tue 03/27 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/27/2018 11:45:20 AM ]. File Size [ 420 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:10 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 03/28 2:18 PM
Pretrial Confernece Held. The Defendant to retain counsel by April 27, 2018. No further hearing will be scheduled at this time. Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). (Rai, Sujata)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/16 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 03/13 1:42 PM
Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default For Failure to Appear and/or Plead Against Mark Sedlak and Danielle Sedlak as authorized by Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7055 signed on March 13, 2018 by Myrna Atwater, Clerk, U.S. Bankruptcy Court. Related [+] 5 Motion For Default against Defendants Mark Sedlak and Danielle Sedlak filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). (Miltenberger, Regina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
court Continued Pretrial Conference Mon 03/12 4:28 PM
Continued Pretrial Conference due to the prediction of inclement weather Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/27/2018 at 11:00 AM United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT for1 , (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
5 5 motion Default Thu 03/08 2:20 PM
Motion For Default against Defendant Mark Sedlak and Defendant Danielle Sedlak Filed by Douglas S. Skalka on behalf of Swim Seventy, LLC, Plaintiff . (Skalka, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 13, 2018
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/14 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, January 11, 2018
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 01/11 10:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on Defendant(s) Danielle Sedlak 1/11/2018; Mark Sedlak 1/11/2018 . (Skalka, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 01/10 6:01 PM
Summons Issued on Defendant(s) Danielle Sedlak Date Issued 1/10/2018, Answer Due 2/9/2018; Mark Sedlak Date Issued 1/10/2018, Answer Due 2/9/2018 Related [+] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Swim Seventy, LLC). Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Room 123, Courtroom, Bridgeport, CT. (Senteio, Renee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/09 10:21 AM
Adversary case 18-05003 Complaint (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) filed by Swim Seventy, LLC against Mark Sedlak, Danielle Sedlak. Fee Amount $350. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Skalka, Douglas)
Related: [-]