New York Southern District Court
Judge:Sidney H Stein
Case #: 1:18-cv-00173
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2018
Terminated:Jun 12, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jul 08, 2018 4:22 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Doculynx, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Alan Martin
Putney Twombly Hall & Hirson LLP
contact info
John Bernard Fulfree
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.
Represented By
Michael Hugh Gibson
Satterlee Stephens LLP
contact info
Defendant
Doculynx, Inc.
as successor-in-interest to Anacomp, Inc. 6916 N.97th Circle
Omaha, NE 68122
Represented By
Thomas Alan Martin
Putney Twombly Hall & Hirson LLP
contact info
John Bernard Fulfree
Smith & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.
85 Broad Street, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Michael Hugh Gibson
Satterlee Stephens LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, July 26, 2018
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/26 5:52 PM
ORDER: granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/6/2018. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/26/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time Thu 07/26 2:08 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Thomas A. Martin dated July 26, 2018. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
26 26 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 07/19 2:05 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:25 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Thomas A. Martin dated July 18, 2018 re: Extension of the deadline. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Motions due by 7/30/2018.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/19/2018) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
25 25 misc Letter Wed 07/18 1:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Thomas A. Martin dated July 18, 2018 re: Extension of the deadline. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
24 24 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/10 4:07 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:23 Letter filed by Doculynx, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 7/23/2018.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/10/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Tue 07/10 2:05 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Thomas A. Martin dated July 10, 2018 re: Extension of the deadline. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 06/12 12:39 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The parties having reported a settlement in this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the matter be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice and without costs, provided that it may be reopened within thirty days of the date of this Order for good cause shown. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/12/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Tue 06/12 12:40 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 06/19 8:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 6/11/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/07 5:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 06/07 5:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/01 5:29 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if a stipulation of dismissal is not submitted to the Court for signature on or before June 20, 2018, the last day to file cross motions for summary judgment is July 5, 2018, and oppositions to any cross motions are due July 20, 2018. If no cross motions are filed on July 5, the parties shall notify the Court and a status conference will be scheduled. (Cross Motions due by 7/5/2018., Responses due by 7/20/2018) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/1/2018) (rro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 06/01 9:55 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 06/29 10:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Telephone Conference held on 6/1/2018. Counsel for both parties participated. (lab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 06/01 9:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 5/31/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/25 8:51 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/25 8:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/18 2:26 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 05/18 2:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 5/17/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/20 9:45 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 4/26/2018 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 04/20 9:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Settlement Conference held on 4/19/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/17 5:54 PM
ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held today, with counsel for all parties present, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The parties are scheduled to meet with Magistrate Judge Pitman in an attempt to resolve this matter on April 19, 2018; 2. The last day for completion of discovery remains at May 31, 2018; 3. There will be a status conference on May 31, 2018, at 2:30 p.m.; 4. The last day to file cross motions for summary judgment is June 28, 2018; 5. The oppositions to the cross motions are due on July 13, 2018; and 6. Any discovery disputes shall be brought to the Court's attention, in writing, far enough in advance of May 31, 2018, in order for the dispute to be adjudicated and any necessary discovery taken before the close of discovery on May 31, 2018. Cross Motions due by 6/28/2018. Responses due by 7/13/2018 Discovery due by 5/31/2018. Status Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/17/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/17 3:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Status Conference held on 4/17/2018. Counsel for all parties were present. (lab)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 09, 2018
19 19 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 03/09 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 2/28/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Transcript Fri 03/09 12:12 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 2/28/2018 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 03/05 12:58 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 03/05 12:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2018. (ajc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/28 2:53 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/28/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/28 2:48 PM
ORDER: A pretrial conference having been held today, with counsel for all parties present, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: There will be a mid discovery status conference on April 17, 2018; The last day for completion of discovery is May 31, 2018; The last day for the parties to file their cross motions for summary judgment is June 28, 2018; and The last day for the parties to file their oppositions to the cross motions is July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED., ( Cross Motions due by 6/28/2018., Discovery due by 5/31/2018., Responses due by 7/13/2018, Status Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/28/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 02/28 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sidney H. Stein: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2018. Counsel for all parties appeared either in person or by telephone. The next conference is scheduled for April 17, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. (lab)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Thu 03/01 12:28 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/26 3:29 PM
ANSWER to13 Counterclaim. Document filed by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc..(Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/20 12:07 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/20/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 02/15 4:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/15 4:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/07 1:14 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from John B. Fulfree dated February 7, 2018. Document filed by Doculynx, Inc..(Fulfree, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/07 12:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Bernard Fulfree on behalf of Doculynx, Inc.. (Fulfree, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/07 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Alan Martin on behalf of Doculynx, Inc.. (Martin, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 02/01 2:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Doculynx, Inc. served on 1/18/2018, answer due 2/8/2018. Service was accepted by Thomas Martin, Esq/Attorney. Document filed by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.. (Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
7 7 order Endorsed Letter ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/29 5:24 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Michael H. Gibson dated 1/22/2018 re: As such, the parties respectfully request that Your Honor accept the transfer of the above action. ENDORSEMENT: I accept the transfer of 18cv173 (JSR) to my docket as related to 17cv5940 SHS), There will be a pretrial conference on Feb. 28, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 2/28/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/29/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Mon 01/29 3:34 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-05940-SHS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 01/29 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/29 3:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (bcu)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Mon 01/29 5:26 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-05940-SHS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 01/22 10:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2018. (Kotowski, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 01/17 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Finally, upon receipt of this notice, please immediately furnish Chambers with a courtesy copy of your complaint and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Statement, if applicable. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 2 1-2018 AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 2/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/17/18) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 01/10 10:14 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Doculynx, Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 01/10 10:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Hugh Gibson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Doculynx, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 01/10 10:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Hugh Gibson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $100,000; the County code has been modified to New York. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 01/10 10:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 01/10 10:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 01/10 10:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 01/09 3:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Doculynx, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.. (Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/09 3:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings, Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.. Document filed by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc..(Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 01/09 3:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/09 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Doculynx, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14555148)Document filed by Oppenheimer & Co. Inc..(Gibson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Master Agreement for Data Imaging Services,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Amendment to Master Agreement for Data Imaging Services,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Summons and Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Settlement Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Sompo Internation Annually Renewable Performance Bond,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- November 15, 2017 Correspondence