District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:18-cv-00047
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2018
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jul 08, 2018 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By
Fred Elmore Haynes
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Fred Elmore Haynes
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
ANIMAL WELFARE INSTITUTE
Represented By
Donald Christian Baur
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Sunny Tsou
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Albert M. Ferlo, Jr.
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/28/2019. (lcckk3)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 10, 2020
56 56 order .Order Fri 04/10 5:20 PM
ORDER for Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4 10-2020 (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
55 55 misc Stipulation Fri 04/10 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of Amended Settlement Agreement and Proposed Order by ANIMAL WELFARE INSTITUTE. (Baur, Donald)
Related: [-]