New York Southern District Court
Judge:William H Pauley, III
Case #: 1:18-cv-00080
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446mv Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2018
Terminated:Feb 22, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 04, 2018 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Main Attraction Freight, LLC
Represented By
Francis Scahill
Picciano & Scahill, Pc(westbury,ny)
contact info
Defendant
Penske Leasing & Rental Co.
Represented By
Francis Scahill
Picciano & Scahill, Pc(westbury,ny)
contact info
Defendant
Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By
Francis Scahill
Picciano & Scahill, Pc(westbury,ny)
contact info
Defendant
Staten Transporation Systems, LLC
Represented By
Francis Scahill
Picciano & Scahill, Pc(westbury,ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jiyeun Hyun


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, March 15, 2018
misc Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF Thu 03/15 7:48 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Francis Scahill for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 7 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Thu 02/22 11:42 AM
ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this action has been or will be settled, this action is discontinued without costs to any party, and without prejudice to reopening this action if such an application is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this Order, and any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for this Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement, they must submit the settlement agreement to this Court within the same thirty-day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. All conferences in this action are hereby vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and mark this case as closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/22/2018) (jwh)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Letter Thu 02/22 8:43 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Francis J. Scahill, Esq. dated 2/22/18 re: request to cancel initial conference due to settlement of case. Document filed by Main Attraction Freight, LLC, Penske Leasing & Rental Co., Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P..(Scahill, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Entry. Document filed by John Does, Main Attraction Freight, LLC, Penske Leasing & Rental Co., Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Staten Transporation Systems, LLC. (Scahill, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
3 3 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 01/17 3:54 PM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/23/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20B at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/17/2018) (mro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 01/09 6:39 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Redesignation Tue 01/09 6:39 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (wb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Francis Scahill. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Does. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Francis Scahill. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 Related [+]; the County code has been modified to Queens. (sj)
Related: [-] moval from State Court
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scahill, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 159687/17. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14540465).Document filed by Main Attraction Freight, LLC, JOHN DOE, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Staten Transporation Systems, LLC, Penske Leasing & Rental Co..(Scahill, Francis)
Related: [-]