U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00057 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 09, 2018 5:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 05/07 12:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA, U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Consovoy, William) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 05/07 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Stipulation of Dismissal17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/7/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Continue
Wed 04/25 4:10 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Status Conference by U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA, U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(Consovoy, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 04/25 4:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Continue16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for April 26, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 30, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/25/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/25 4:50 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 5/30/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) |
||
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/19 4:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Harris, :Firm- Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC, :Address- 3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700. Phone No. - (703) 243-9423. Fax No. - (703) 243-8696 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5432684. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA, U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(Consovoy, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Harris, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/19 5:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Jeffrey Matthew Harris is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/19/2018. (lcrdm1, ) |
||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/18 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing of List of Contents of Administrative Record by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION(Clark, Denise) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Contents of Administrative Record, | ||
Att: 2 DOJ Certification, | ||
Att: 3 DOT-PHMSA Certification, | ||
Att: 4 DOT-OIG Certification | ||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/13 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Denise) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Sealed Document
Tue 03/20 5:48 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION re11 Answer to Complaint,1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Nebeker, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit UNredacted Answer with highlighting showing locations of redactions | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/20 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion For Leave To Submit Unredacted Answer Under Seal10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. It is further ORDERED that the Unredacted Answer shall be accepted for filing under seal and shall be available for viewing only by counsel for the parties and by the Court and its employees. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
||
order
.Order
Tue 03/20 10:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on April 26, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding a proposed briefing schedule and whether any areas of agreement exist in advance of the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/20 12:00 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/19 9:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Nebeker, William) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/19 9:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION Leave To Submit Unredacted Answer Under Seal re1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION(Nebeker, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/22 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Nebeker, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 02/06 9:17 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/17/2018 (Consovoy, William) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 02/06 9:15 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 1/19/2018 (Consovoy, William) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Tue 02/06 9:13 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2018. (Consovoy, William) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/16 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice3 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Michael H. Park may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/16/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
.Order
Thu 01/11 6:18 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/18. (lcrdm3, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 01/11 5:49 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (zmd) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
service
Summons Not Issued
Thu 01/11 5:51 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General.....SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED. (md) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/10 5:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael H. Park, :Firm- Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC, :Address- 3 Columbus Circle, 15th Floor, New York, NW 10019. Phone No. - 212-247-10019. Fax No. - 703-243-9423 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5281934. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA, U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC.(Consovoy, William) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 01/10 4:15 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA, U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Consovoy, William) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/10 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5281727) filed by U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL, INC., U-HAUL CO. OF PENNSYLVANIA.(Consovoy, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 01/11 5:36 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) |