Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-21866

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:18-ap-01010
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2018
Terminated:Apr 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC
2925 PGA Blvd #204
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410
Represented By
Nicholas B. Bangos, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/25 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1010 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Wed 04/04 2:35 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/16 12:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant MLIC Asset Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
8 8 order Extend Time Order Fri 02/16 9:38 AM
Agreed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] #7
Thursday, February 15, 2018
7 7 motion Extend Time Thu 02/15 12:09 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant MLIC Asset Holdings, LLC (Barnes, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
6 6 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 01/23 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nicholas B. Bangos Esq. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
5 5 5 pgs order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 01/16 11:26 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 01/16 11:26 AM
Summons Issued on MLIC Asset Holdings, LLC Answer Due 2/15/2018 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 04/12/2018 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 4 (RAM), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC
Monday, January 15, 2018
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/15 3:45 PM
Amended Complaint by Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC against MLIC Asset Holdings, LLC. Complaint Amended to MLIC Asset Holdings, LLC. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 18-01010 Complaint by Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC against Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Company. Nature of Suit:,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) filed by Plaintiff Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
Thursday, January 11, 2018
2 2 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 01/11 12:15 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Case Number Indicated on PDF Image and the Plaintiff's/Defendant's Name on the PDF Image are Also Different from What is Listed as the Party Filer in the Docket Entry. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED **MOTION/DOCUMENT** WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/10 11:47 PM
Adversary case 18-01010 Complaint by Lakeshore Properties of South Florida, LLC against Metrolpolitan Life Insurance Company. Nature of Suit:,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]