Town of Cherokee Alabama et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45005 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 3:17-cv-02086 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:57 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC. F/K/A PAR PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company a/k/a J M Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WalMart, Inc., f/k/a/ Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
johnson & johnson
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt, PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Town of Cherokee Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Tuscumbia Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Colbert Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Franklin Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/04/2019 4:42 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health Inc from Circuit Court of Franklin County, Alabama, case number 33-CV-2017-900247.00 filed by Cardinal Health Inc.With Jury Demand Contained Within the Body of the Complaint(AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 141 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Haikala until further notice. Please use case number 3:17-CV-2086-UJH-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc. filed by Cardinal Health Inc (Hymer, David) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Joint MOTION to Stay by Cardinal Health Inc. (Hymer, David) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Berdy, Christopher) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. filed by McKesson Corporation (Prater, Harlan) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE by Cardinal Health Inc Notice of Related Action filed in MDL No. 2804(Hymer, David) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action Schedule of Action, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint and Docket Sheet for Potential Tag-Along Action | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Mattei, Blair) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2995643 (B4601085566). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cardinal Health Inc from Circuit Court of Franklin County, Alabama, case number 33-CV-2017-900247.00 filed by Cardinal Health Inc.With Jury Demand Contained Within the Body of the Complaint(AHI). (Hymer, David) Modified on 12/28/2017 (SPT ). [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; docket entries sent electronically to Clerk of Court Northern District of Ohio. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 1/10/2018.] | |
10 | 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 3:17-cv-02086. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |