People of the State of Illinois et al v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45007 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Central, 3:17-cv-03293 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:57 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 105, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 108, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 112, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Shelby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People of Shelby County
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People of the State of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:30 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2726289.), filed by People of Shelby County, People of the State of Illinois, County of Shelby.(Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas J Lech on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lech, Thomas) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ann E Callis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Callis, Ann) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory R Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Gregory) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Eric D Holland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holland, Eric) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crompton, Randall) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
MDL Remark: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) Finalized on 1/10/18. Please see pleading (3 in ALM/1:17-cv-00838, 3 in ALM/2:17-cv-00836, 3 in ALM/2:17-cv-00840, 3 in ALN/3:17-cv-02086, 3 in FLS/9:17-cv-81384, 3 in ILC/3:17-cv-03293, 4 in ILS/3:17-cv-01338, 3 in ILS/3:17-cv-01340, 3 in ILS/3:17-cv-01342, 3 in INS/1:17-cv-04591, 3 in KS/6:17-cv-01313, 3 in KYE/0:17-cv-00130, 3 in KYW/1:17-cv-00196, 3 in KYW/3:17-cv-00727, 3 in KYW/4:17-cv-00157, 3 in MA/3:17-cv-30175, 525 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MOW/5:17-cv-06141, 3 in MSN/4:17-cv-00189, 3 in MSN/4:17-cv-00190, 3 in MSN/4:17-cv-00191, 3 in MSS/2:17-cv-00199, 3 in MSS/2:17-cv-00200, 3 in MSS/3:17-cv-01012, 3 in MSS/5:17-cv-00150, 4 in MT/4:17-cv-00130, 3 in NCE/7:17-cv-00241, 4 in NCM/1:17-cv-01085, 3 in NCM/1:17-cv-01114, 4 in OHS/2:17-cv-01064, 3 in OHS/2:17-cv-01097, 4 in OHS/2:17-cv-01102, 3 in OHS/2:17-cv-01105, 3 in PR/3:17-cv-02364, 3 in PR/3:17-cv-02371, 3 in TNM/2:17-cv-00078, 3 in TXS/4:17-cv-03756).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/10/2018.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804 et al. (TB) (TK, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | ||
7 | 7 MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-3) - 36 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALM/1:17-cv-00838, 1 in ALM/2:17-cv-00836, 1 in ALM/2:17-cv-00840, 1 in ALN/3:17-cv-02086, 1 in FLS/9:17-cv-81384, 1 in ILC/3:17-cv-03293, 2 in ILS/3:17-cv-01338, 1 in ILS/3:17-cv-01340, 1 in ILS/3:17-cv-01342, 1 in INS/1:17-cv-04591, 1 in KS/6:17-cv-01313, 1 in KYE/0:17-cv-00130, 1 in KYW/1:17-cv-00196, 1 in KYW/3:17-cv-00727, 1 in KYW/4:17-cv-00157, 1 in MA/3:17-cv-30175, 444 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOW/5:17-cv-06141, 1 in MSN/4:17-cv-00189, 1 in MSN/4:17-cv-00190, 1 in MSN/4:17-cv-00191, 1 in MSS/2:17-cv-00199, 1 in MSS/2:17-cv-00200, 1 in MSS/3:17-cv-01012, 1 in MSS/5:17-cv-00150, 2 in MT/4:17-cv-00130, 1 in NCE/7:17-cv-00241, 2 in NCM/1:17-cv-01085, 1 in NCM/1:17-cv-01114, 2 in OHS/2:17-cv-01064, 1 in OHS/2:17-cv-01097, 1 in OHS/2:17-cv-01102, 1 in OHS/2:17-cv-01105, 1 in PR/3:17-cv-02364, 1 in PR/3:17-cv-02371, 1 in TNM/2:17-cv-00078, 1 in TXS/4:17-cv-03756) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/10/2018.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804 et al. (TB) (TK, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio. This case is terminated. (TK, ilcd) [Transferred from ilcd on 1/10/2018.] | |
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Central. Case number 3:17-cv-03293. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |