Sunflower County, Mississippi v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45020 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Northern, 4:17-cv-00189 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:57 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Sunflower County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 1/11/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1504262, filed by Sunflower County, Mississippi. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of RICO Statement by Tina M. Bullock on behalf of Sunflower County, Mississippi (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 1/11/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm) [Transferred from msnd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (tab) [Transferred from msnd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
Judge Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) assigned to case. (P,R) | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Northern. Case number 4:17-cv-00189. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |