Yadkin County, North Carolina v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45014 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:17-cv-01085 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:58 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC,
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Yadkin County, North Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:48 PM EDT |
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2250509.), filed by YADKIN COUNTY, NORTH CAROLINA.(COATES, PAUL) [Transferred from ncmd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVERSHEET, | ||
Att: 2 CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from ncmd on 1/11/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
ELECTRONIC TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS to the Northern District of Ohio. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 1/11/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on 1/10/2018.(Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 NDOH Text Order for MDL No. 2804 (CTO-3) | ||
3 | 3 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:17-cv-01085. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |