Fiscal Court of Hopkins County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45010 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Western, 4:17-cv-00157 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 4:58 PM EST |
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Hopkins County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:55 PM EDT |
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2552713); filed by The Fiscal Court of Hopkins County. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 12/4/2017: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of nondispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. cc: counsel (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS sent to Plaintiff's Attorney Paul T. Farrell, Jr. re1 Complaint. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
5 | 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency sent to Attorney R. Edison Hill re1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/18/2017. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency sent to Attorney Peter J. Mougey re1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/18/2018. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency sent to Attorney J. Burton LeBlanc re1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/18/2017. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
8 | 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency sent to Attorney Anthony J. Majestro re1 Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 12/18/2017. (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. no longer assigned to casecc: counsel, KH (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
10 | 10 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/5/2017: Pursuant to the Order reassigning at DN9 , the Referral Order previously entered at DN3 is hereby RESCINDED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
12 | 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2561502. by Plaintiff Hopkins County Fiscal Court (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Peter J. Mougey | ||
14 | 14 MOTION for J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2561519. by Plaintiff Hopkins County Fiscal Court (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Burton Leblanc, IV | ||
15 | 15 MOTION for R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2561526. by Plaintiff Hopkins County Fiscal Court (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of R. Edison Hill | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/20/17; granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Edison Hill. cc: Counsel(DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
17 | 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/20/17; granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Burton LeBlanc, IV. cc: Counsel(DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
18 | 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/20/17; granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter J. Mougey. cc: Counsel(DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 3 from OHND re: MDL 2804 (MLG) [Transferred from kywd on 1/11/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 4:17-cv-00157. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |