Original Case: 2:11-cv-05912

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-56332
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2013
Terminated:Mar 14, 2018
Last checked: Friday Mar 16, 2018 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
MOTHERLESS, INC., a New York corporation
Represented By
David Speer Richman
Theodora Oringher PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSHUA LANGE, an individual
Represented By
David Speer Richman
Theodora Oringher PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VENTURA CONTENT, LTD., an Anguilla corporation
Represented By
John Tehranian
One LLP
contact info
Christopher Arledge
One LLP
contact info
Peter Afrasiabi
One LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2018
FILED OPINION (ANDREW J. KLEINFELD, JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) AFFIRMED. Judge: AJK Authoring, Judge: JBR Dissenting, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10797616] [13-56332, 13-56970]

Docket last updated: 03/16/2018 1:36 AM PDT
Thursday, August 01, 2013
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/08/2013. Transcript ordered by 08/30/2013. Transcript due 11/29/2013. Appellant Ventura Content, Ltd. opening brief due 01/08/2014. Appellees Joshua Lange and Motherless, Inc. answering brief due 02/07/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8726238] (BG) [Entered: 08/01/2013 09:47 AM]
Related: [-]