IN RE: Bank of America Corp.
Original Case: 1:09-md-02058
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-cv-02919 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2013 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 19, 2016 4:40 AM EST |
Appellant
Flanagan, Lieberman, Hoffman & Swaim
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Ohio Public Employees Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Martin I. Fineberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., 4 World Financial Cneter, New York, NY 10080
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gary A. Carlin
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nelson Chai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth D. Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John A. Thain
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Frank P. Bramble, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
William Barnet, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John T. Collins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gary L. Countryman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tommy R. Franks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Charles K. Gifford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Monica C. Lozano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Walter E. Massey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas J. May
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Patricia E. Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas M. Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
O. Temple Sloan, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Meredith R. Spangler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robert L. Tillman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jackie M. Ward
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Neil A. Cotty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joe L. Price
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Banc of America Securities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J. Steele Alphin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Amy Woods Brinkley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Barbara J. Desoer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Liam E. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Timothy J. Mayopoulos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brian T. Moynihan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bruce L. Hammonds
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Richard K. Struthers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Corporation Corporate Benefits Committee Defendants
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America Compensation and Benefits Committee Defendants
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Keith T. Banks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Teresa Brenner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carol T. Christ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Armando M. Codina
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Virgis W. Colbert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Curl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John D. Finnegan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fox-Pitt Kelton Cochran Caronia Waller (USA) L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J.C. Flowers & Co., L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judith Mayhew Jonas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Kraus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Aulana L. Peters
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph W. Prueher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ann N. Reese
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Ross
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Charles O. Rossotti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Stingi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas K. Montag
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth D. Davis
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth A. Lewis
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph L. Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve R. Graber, Individually and as assignee of claims of the SRG 2008 Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
International Fund Management, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deka International S.A. Luxemburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deka Investment GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Katz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Katz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Fineberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sylvia Weissmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Parker Family Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey R. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The 1997 Jeffrey R. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drew E. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The 1994 Drew E. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith D. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie M. Sorin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The 1991 Jeffrey R. Parker Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The 1994 Julie P. Mantell Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael A. Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark D. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elliot Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penina Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley L. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Razelle M. Wender
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill W. Goldstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry E. Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEF Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
1976 Real Estate Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Finger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Jerry E. Finger Family Trust D/T/D 12/28/1989
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Jerry E. Finger Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leo R. Jalenak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peggy E. Jalenak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KERS & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab S&P 500 Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab 1000 Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Institutional Select S&P 500 Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Dividend Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Core Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Premier Equity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Fundamental US Large Company Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Total Stock Market Index Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab S&P 500 Index Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Markettrack Growth Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Markettrack Balanced Portfolio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Investments
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Capital Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schwab Financial Services Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Public Pension Funds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
The Public Pension Fund Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven J. Sklar, as (IRA Account Beneficiary), on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rhonda Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael R. Bahnmaier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alma Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mark Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Elizabeth Eagen
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Vernon C. Dailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard Adame
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Arlene Kahn
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Petra Chatman
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Grant Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
New York State Teachers' Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Public Employees' Retirement Association of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dr. Salomon Melgen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Flor Melgen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SFM Holdings Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
DI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ambassador Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Select Investors Exchange Fund, L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Robert Gegnas, 198 Locha Drive, Jupiter, FL 33458-7752
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven L. Shapiro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Harvey M. Mitnick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Nathan A. Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Bonnie Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kenneth A. Ciullo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Joanna Ciullo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Thomas P. DiNapoli, Comptroller of the State of New York, as Administrative Head of The New York State and Local Retirement Systems and as Sole Trustee of The New York State Common Retirement Fund
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 17 2016
OPINION, vacating the district court's orders and remanading to the district court, by JMW, DJ, DAL, FILED.[1729549] [13-2919] |
Docket last updated: 02/18/2016 4:41 PM EST |
Friday, August 02, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Flanagan, Lieberman, Hoffman & Swaim, FILED. [1009639] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:43 PM] | |
Att: 1 383 pgs Case FILED | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
2 | 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Flanagan, Lieberman, Hoffman & Swaim, district court docket entry re: receipt # 02088746146, FILED.[1009645] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:45 PM] | |
3 | 3 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/08/2013, RECEIVED.[1009649] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:46 PM] | |
4 | 4 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/11/2013, RECEIVED.[1009653] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:47 PM] | |
5 | 5 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/03/2013, RECEIVED.[1009656] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:48 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1009662] 13-2919 [Entered: 08/06/2013 04:49 PM] |