Fiscal Court of Henderson County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45069 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Western, 4:17-cv-00130 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:00 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Fiscal Court of Henderson County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:09 PM EDT |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 68 pgs COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2517819., filed by The Fiscal Court of Henderson County. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Tina Lantz | ||
2 | 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to McKesson Corporation | ||
4 | 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. no longer assigned to casecc: Counsel (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 170 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Fiscal Court of Henderson County. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2524763. by Plaintiff The Fiscal Court of Henderson County (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - LOUISIANA STATE BAR, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2524805. by Plaintiff The Fiscal Court of Henderson County (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2524810. by Plaintiff The Fiscal Court of Henderson County (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF AL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF FL | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
11 | 11 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/13/2017 granting9 Motion for Peter J. Mougey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
12 | 12 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/13/2017 granting8 Motion for Attorney R. Edison Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
13 | 13 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/13/2017 granting7 Motion for Attorney J. Burton LeBlanc, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JBM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Fiscal Court of Henderson County. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
18 | 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Fiscal Court of Henderson County. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Fiscal Court of Henderson County. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 11/14/17: Plaintiff's counsel will continue to effectuate service of the Complaint and/or anyAmended Complaint in this action. Defendants will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary court administrative filings in a timely manner after service. All responsive pleadings to the applicable Complaint or Amended Complaint are stayed and all affirmative defenses preserved until further order of the Court. cc: Counsel (DJT) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven B. Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from OHND. MDL #2804 (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 12/15/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 4:17-cv-00130. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |