Fiscal Court of Greenup County v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45088 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 0:17-cv-00105 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:00 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Fiscal Court of Greenup County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:43 PM EDT |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3900306), filed by Fiscal Court of Greenup County.(JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Tina Lantz, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Amerisourcebergen, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Cardinal Health, | ||
Att: 6 Summons for McKesson | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER 1. Effective immediately, the clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, et al. filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/17.(JLS)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 COPY of Motion to Transfer filed with JPML re: Transfer of Case for inclusion of National Prescription Opiate Litigation from James Peterson (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Motion to Transfer Cases | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3905989)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - LOUISIANA STATE BAR, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906036)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF APPEALS, WEST VIRGINIA | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906048)(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF FL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF AL | ||
9 | 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fiscal Court of Greenup County.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Peter J. Mougey, R. Edison Hill, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV re7 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906036),8 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906048),6 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3905989). (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of VanTatenhove for review: re7 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906036),8 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3906048),6 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Fiscal Court of Greenup County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3905989) (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Clerk's Note: re9 Amended Complaint; The Clerk notes an Amended Complaint was filed; however, no summons were provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Court's website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days . (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
Attorney Update. Attorney Gregory E. Mayes, Jr for McKesson Corporation added. (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
13 | 13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of VanTatenhove for review: re13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Margaret Brannon.12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
15 | 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Stephen Loy.13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation has been filed by Cardinal Health without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/27/2018. (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
17 | 17 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
18 | 18 ORDER: 1) granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 2) J. Burton LeBlanc IV is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in the above styled action 3) R. Edison Hill is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in the above styled action 4) Peter J. Mougey is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/27/17. (SMT)cc: COR, Fuller via USMail [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
19 | 19 ORDER; 1) Parties Agreed Motion to Stay is GRANTED 2) Action shall be STAYED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 3) Plaintiff's counsel will continue to effectuate service of the complaint and/or any amended complaint in this action 4) Defendant's will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary court adm filings in a timely matter after service 5) Parties SHALL FILE a status report 180 days from date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/27/17.(SMT)cc: COR, Fuller via USMail [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fiscal Court of Greenup County. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
21 | 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fiscal Court of Greenup County. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fiscal Court of Greenup County. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brian Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: re1 Complaint,. Clerk forwarded via email a copy of the Complaint and Docket Sheet to the MDL Panel re MDL 2804, Opiod Crises Cases w/copy to Sharon Vrolijk. (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
25 | 25 CERTIFIED ORDER received from MDL Panel re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel ; Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Transfer Order filed in MDL CTO No. CTO-1 filed in MDL Case Number 2804 (SMT)cc: COR (SMT). [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: NO MAIN DOCUMENT WAS ATTACHED to docket entry by docket clerk; re25 Case Transferred to MDL ; Correct document attached to this entry. cc: COR (SMT) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] |