Fiscal Court of Kenton County v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45089 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 2:17-cv-00182 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:00 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenton County Fiscal Court
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:29 PM EDT |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
Conflict Check run. (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 69 pgs COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3903375), filed by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County.(LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Tina Lantz, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons - Amerisourcebergen, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons - Cardinal Health, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons - McKesson | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
4 | 4 STANDING ORDER: 1. Effective immediately, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ASSIGN all matters related to the case, Anderson County Fiscal Court v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al filed as Frankfort Civil Action 17-cv-70 to the Honorable Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/2017.(LST)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: The letter and motion to transfer previously entered at docket entry 5 has been deleted (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Peter J. Mougey, J. Burton LeBlanc, IV, R. Edison Hill re7 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909199),6 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909164),5 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909151). (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re7 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909199),6 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909164),5 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909151) (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909151)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF J. BURTON LEBLANC, IV, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - LOUISIANA STATE BAR, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for R. EDISON HILL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909164)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF R. EDISON HILL, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for PETER J. MOUGEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Fiscal Court of Kenton County ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-3909199)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF PETER J. MOUGEY, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF AL, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING - SUPREME COURT OF FL | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Phillips, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
11 | 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Steven B. Loy.11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation has been filed by Cardinal Health without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
13 | 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Margaret Jane Brannon.10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE,11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation has been filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Brannon, Margaret) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16 171 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenton County Fiscal Court.(Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER: 1. The Plaintiffs Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice5 ;6 ;7 are GRANTED; 2. J. Burton LeBlanc, IV is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-styled action; 3. R. Edison Hill is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above styled action; and 4. Peter J. Mougey is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above styled action.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/1/2017. (LST)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenton County Fiscal Court. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
19 | 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenton County Fiscal Court. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenton County Fiscal Court. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (Farrell, Paul) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER; 1)Parties to SHOW CAUSE within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order as to why the action should be stayed.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/14/2017.(LST)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
22 | 22 NOTICE by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Notice of Related Action filed in MDL No. 2804)(Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Schedule of Actions, | ||
Att: 2 Amended Complaint and Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Brian Loy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
24 | 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation21 filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Loy, Steven) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
25 | 25 ORDER: 1. The parties Agreed Motion to Stay11 is GRANTED;2. This action shall be STAYED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation; 3. Plaintiffs counsel will continue to effectuate service of the Complaint and/or any 4. Defendants will make a formal notice of appearance and necessary court administrative filings in a timely manner after service; and 5. The parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than one-hundred and eighty (180) days from the date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments.. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 11/28/2017. (LST)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
Clerk's Note: Incorrect CTO order was filed at de 27 and has been deleted (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | ||
26 | 26 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (LST) [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] | |
27 | 27 CERTIFIED ORDER received from U.S. District Court - Northern District Of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 1 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/14/2017.(LST)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 12/18/2017.] |