Tallapoosa County, Alabama v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:17-op-45097 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2017 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 3:17-cv-00763 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:00 PM EST |
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Tallapoosa County, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/04/2019 4:40 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tallapoosa County, Alabama. (dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc.1 for pdf.) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] | ||
1 | 1 162 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602047424.), filed by Tallapoosa County, Alabama.(dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Filing Fee Receipt | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Tallapoosa County, Alabama. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] | |
3 | 3 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 12/14/2017 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC, Northern District of Ohio. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] | |
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (djy, ) [Transferred from almd on 12/18/2017.] |