Raider Marketing, LP Jointly Administered under 18-30155
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-30169 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2019 |
Type | Partnership |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Raider Marketing, LP, Debtor
12377 Merit Dr Ste 1700
Dallas, TX 75251-2256 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 08/13 4:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LinhthuDo) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 10/30 10:46 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 1 Richardson Independent School District (JenniferOlson) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/18 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/18 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Thu 01/18 3:43 PM
Declaration re: for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Raider Marketing, LP ). (gkel) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Tue 01/16 4:55 PM
|
|
3 | 3
order
Emergency
Tue 01/16 10:14 AM
Order Granting Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Signed on 1/16/2018. (than) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Emergency Motion
Tue 01/16 12:51 AM
Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing set for January 18, 2018 at 2:30 PM, Courtroom 404 Filed by Debtor Raider Marketing, LP (Helt, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 01/16 10:14 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (than) |
||
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 01/15 11:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Raider Marketing, LP. (Helt, Marcus) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/15 11:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-30169 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19681217. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |