Lori Rocca v. Fitness International, LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00058 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 14, 2018 2:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fitness International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Lori Rocca
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 06/29 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Lori Rocca. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 05/18 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. re: Notice of Settlement13 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Fri 05/18 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Lori Rocca. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/20 2:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Entering Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint11 . The Court, the Honorable Cormac J. Carney, Judge presiding, having read and considered the stipulation to extend time to respond to the complaint by 30 days, hereby finds good cause exists to further extend Fitness International, LLC's deadline to respond to the complaint to May 23, 2018. ANY FURTHER REQUESTS FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME ARE STRONGLY DISFAVORED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/16 11:45 AM
Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fitness International, LLC answer now due 5/23/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Fitness International, LLC.(Merryman, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/20 9:58 AM
ORDER ENTERING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)9 . The Court, the Honorable Cormack J. Carney, Judge presiding, having read and considered the stipulation to extend time to respond to the complaint by 31 days, hereby finds good cause exists to further extend Fitness International, LLC's deadline to respond to the complaint to April 23, 2018. (dv) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Fri 03/16 2:52 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 23, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Fitness International, LLC.(Merryman, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 02/13 10:10 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fitness International, LLC answer now due 3/23/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Fitness International, LLC.(Attorney Bryan A Merryman added to party Fitness International, LLC(pty:dft))(Merryman, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 01/16 2:49 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint1 as to defendant Fitness International, LLC. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 2:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 01/16 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 01/15 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lori Rocca, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 01/15 1:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lori Rocca. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 01/15 1:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Lori Rocca. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 01/15 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21098951 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Lori Rocca. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Lori Rocca(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |