Kim v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00321 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 15, 2018 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Devinder Kumar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa T. Su
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Theodore Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Henry Pua Ang
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Howard Clark
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Darrel Dagdigian
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Pramela Dojoy
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Thomas Eric Underwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doyun Kim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
56 | 56
![]() JUDGMENT in a Civil Case Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
![]() NOTICE by Howard Clark, Darrel Dagdigian re54 Order on Motion to Dismiss, of Intent Not to File Amended Complaint (Goldberg, Jacob) |