South Carolina District Court
Judge:Cameron Mcgowan Currie
Case #: 3:18-cv-00116
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2018
Terminated:Jul 26, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 11, 2018 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Imboden Child Development Center
Represented By
Terri Hearn Bailey
Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Ms. Ticnicko Newton
Represented By
Donald Gist
Gist Law Firm
contact info
Aaron Vernon Wallace
Gist Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 26, 2018
20 20 misc Judgment Thu 07/26 9:12 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
19 19 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 07/26 9:09 AM
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/26/2018.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
18 18 respm Sur Reply Brief Tue 07/24 10:50 AM
REPLY to SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Imboden Child Development Center. (Bailey, Terri) Modified to edit text on 7/24/2018 (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 23, 2018
17 17 respm Sur Reply Brief Mon 07/23 3:49 PM
SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Ticnicko Newton. (Gist, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/18 9:08 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Government has voluntarily produced additional documents relating to the nature of Plaintiff's employment. Plaintiff shall review those documents and file a sur-reply no later than 5:30 p.m. on July 23, 2018, addressing the import of the recently produced documents on her (1) assertion she is not a federal employee and (2) arguments in opposition to the motion to dismiss. The Government shall inform the court no later than 5:30 p.m. on July 24, 2018 whether it intends to respond to the sur-reply. (Sur-reply Brief due by 7/23/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 7/18/2018. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/27 4:50 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Imboden Child Development Center. Filing corrected for event type (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - DA Form 3434,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from AR 215-3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Appointment Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - DA Form 3
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/20 4:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Ticnicko Newton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/27/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Gist, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/11 4:36 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 7/16/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/10/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/5/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/5/2018, Discovery due by 12/31/2018, Motion in Limine due by 5/13/2019, Motions due by 1/14/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/25/2019, Bench Trial Deadline 6/3/2019, ADR Statement due by 2/11/2019, Mediation Due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 6/11/2018. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 06/11 3:44 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Imboden Child Development Center.(Bailey, Terri)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Other Mon 06/11 2:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than June 25, 2018. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 06/11 2:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Imboden Child Development Center. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Bailey, Terri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
7 7 order Order Wed 04/18 3:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court deems plaintiff's response to the order to show cause to be proof of service of the instant action but, makes no determination as to the adequacy of the service. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/18/2018. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 04/18 1:11 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ticnicko Newton.(Gist, Donald) Modified to edit text on 4/18/2018 (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - January 2018 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - April 5, 2018 Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - April 9, 2018 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Certified Mail Receipt,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Return Receipt Cards,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - USPS Tracking,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - USPS Tracking
Monday, April 16, 2018
5 5 order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/16 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to file proof that the complaint has been served despite the pendency of this action for more than 90 days. See FRCP 4(c), 4(m). Plaintiff has, likewise, failed to comply with Local Civil Rule 4.01 which requires Plaintiff to inform the court of such non-service and the reasons for the non-service. The court, therefore, directs Plaintiff to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure of service. Plaintiff shall respond to this order no later than April 23, 2018. FAILURE TO RESPOND TO THIS ORDER BY THAT DEADLINE SHALL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2018) Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 4/16/2018. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 01/16 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Imboden Child Development Center. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 01/16 9:31 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ticnicko Newton.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/16 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Imboden Child Development Center (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7555376) filed by Ticnicko Newton. Service due by 4/12/2018(cbru, )
Related: [-]