Electronic Creations Corp. v. Sitrok et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00061 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 11, 2018 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
EPF.com
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Sitrok
|
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
EP&F Capital PLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Electronic Creations Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
So Ordered
Tue 11/13 4:44 PM
So Ordered re34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Electronic Creations Corp.. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/13/2018. (dvanm, ) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 11/13 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Electronic Creations Corp. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/09 3:59 PM
ORDER - Intervenor-Plaintiff EP&F Capital PLC ("EP&F") has advised the Court that it is no longer pursuing any claim against intervenor-defendant Patrick Sitrok32 . Given this Court's Order dismissing EP&F's Intervening Complaint31 , EP&F no longer has any interest in this action, and it is herebyORDERED that EP&F need not make any further appearances in this action, including at the Pretrial Conference scheduled for November 15,2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/09/2018. (dvanm, ) |
|
32 | 32
respoth
Response Other
Fri 11/09 3:03 PM
Response to31 Order, filed by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/07 3:06 PM
ORDER re30 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EP&F Capital PLC. It is hereby ORDERED that ECC and EP&F show cause, within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order, why Sitrok should not be dismissed and this action terminated. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/07/2018. (see Order for further details)(dvanm, ) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/07 10:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Partial Dismissal and Consent to Declaratory Judgment by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Thu 07/05 2:00 PM
|
|
28 | 28
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Thu 07/05 2:00 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by November 9, 2018. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. At the request of the parties, the pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 11, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/05/18. (cmar, ) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Discovery Plan
Mon 07/02 1:15 PM
Proposed Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Electronic Creations Corp..(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/20 2:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 11/9/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/20/18.(yguy) |
|
Att: 1 Mag.Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 06/13 12:08 PM
NOTICE by Electronic Creations Corp. re12 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,, (Barnes, Attison) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 06/13 10:59 AM
Notice of Correction re24 Affidavit, An incomplete document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit
Tue 06/12 2:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT re12 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,, by Electronic Creations Corp.. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 06/01 10:29 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim re20 Order on Motion to Intervene,13 MOTION to Intervene by Electronic Creations Corp.. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/23 2:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Patrick Sitrok. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(dvanm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 05/18 11:36 AM
Proposed Summons to Patrick Sitrok by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Mon 05/14 8:19 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Intervene. Intervenor-Plaintiff, EP&F Capital PLC's Complaint shall be deemed filed as the date of this Order; Plaintiff/Intervenor-Defendant Electronic Creations Corp. is ORDERED to answer or move in response to the Complaint within 21 days. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 05/11/2018. (dvanm, ) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 05/11 12:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Intervene filed by Electronic Creations Corp.. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 05/08 11:36 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 05/08/2018. (dvanm, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/08 8:41 AM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, ) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/07 3:06 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Peter McGrath, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel Haig V. Kalbian Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6073083. by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/07 2:59 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 05/07 2:57 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for May 18, 2018 re13 MOTION to Intervene (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
14 | 14
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 05/07 2:54 PM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION to Intervene filed by EP&F Capital PLC. (Kalbian, Haig) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Intervene
Mon 05/07 2:51 PM
MOTION to Intervene by EP&F Capital PLC.(Kalbian, Haig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Intervening Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Fri 03/16 7:17 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Service by Publication. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:1. That a copy of this Order be published in either The Washington Post or TheWashington Times at least once per week for six consecutive weeks beginning within fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order; and 2. That Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on: (i) the epf.com domain name(the "Domain Name") by e-mail to the e-mail address listed in the domain name registration record for the Domain Name at the time of the Complaint; and (ii) Verisign, Inc., as the person or persons in possession of the epf.com domain name. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 03/15/2018. (see Order for further details) (dvanm, ) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Waiver of
Mon 03/12 6:21 PM
Waiver of re9 MOTION for Service by Publication Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 Waiver of Hearing by Electronic Creations Corp. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
10 | 10
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 03/12 6:20 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION for Service by Publication Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 filed by Electronic Creations Corp..(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Weslow Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Rabenold Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Due Diligence | ||
9 | 9
motion
Service by Publication
Mon 03/12 6:17 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 by Electronic Creations Corp..(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/07 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Patrick Sitrok. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(dvanm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 02/06 2:55 PM
Proposed Summons to Patrick Sitrok by Electronic Creations Corp.. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/29 3:45 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice3 Motion for service pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1655. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/29/2018. (dvanm, ) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Waiver of
Fri 01/26 8:38 AM
Waiver of re3 MOTION for Service and Order to Plead Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 Waiver of Hearing by Electronic Creations Corp. (Barnes, Attison) |
|
4 | 4
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 01/26 8:37 AM
Memorandum in Support re3 MOTION for Service and Order to Plead Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 filed by Electronic Creations Corp..(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Weslow Declaration | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 01/26 8:36 AM
MOTION for Service and Order to Plead Pursuant to 28 USC 1655 by Electronic Creations Corp..(Barnes, Attison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/16 10:48 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Electronic Creations Corp. (dvanm, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/16 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against EPF.com, Patrick Sitrok ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5895817.), filed by Electronic Creations Corp..(dvanm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |