Burton et al v. Cissna et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Referred: | Edmund F Brennan |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00095 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 15, 2018 1:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
L. Francis Cissna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elisabeth E. Clerie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jefferson Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anton S. Tishakov
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 02/23 9:17 AM
CASE CLOSED pursuant to6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Kastilahn, A) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Robert Burton, Anton S. Tishakov. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath for L. Francis Cissna,Audrey Benison Hemesath for Elisabeth E. Clerie,Audrey Benison Hemesath for Jefferson Sessions (Hemesath, Audrey) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 5/10/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to *L. Francis Cissna, Elisabeth E. Clerie, Jefferson Sessions* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jennifer Leah Rozdzielski* *Law Office of Carl Shusterman* *600 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1550* *Los Angeles, CA 90017-3242*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Robert Burton, Anton S Tishakov. Attorney Rozdzielski, Jennifer Leah added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7455732) (Rozdzielski, Jennifer) |