Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45052 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:17-cv-05491 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:02 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe, The
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:43 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5873255) filed by The Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 6th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 17-cv-5491 JRT/LIB. (LPH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (LPH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Noramco, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (LPH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (LPH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation. Jointly Signed by The Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe. (Ponessa, Russell) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
7 | 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation. (Ponessa, Russell) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
8 | 8 STIPULATION by Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe, The. Jointly Signed by Purdue Pharma, L.P., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., et al.. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
9 | 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 Stipulation,. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Mark S. Cheffo, R. Ryan Stoll, Steven A. Reed, Brian M. Ercole, Charles C. Lifland, Sean Morris, Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (kt) cc: Mark S. Cheffo, R. Ryan Stoll, Steven A. Reed, Brian M. Ercole, Charles C. Lifland, Sean Morris, Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
11 | 11 ORDER re6 Stipulation. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation answer due 3/9/2018; McKesson Corporation answer due 3/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/11/2018. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
12 | 12 ORDER re8 Stipulation. Actavis Pharma, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Actavis, LLC answer due 4/10/2018; Cephalon, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Johnson & Johnson answer due 4/10/2018; Mallinckrodt LLC answer due 4/10/2018; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Purdue Pharma L.P. answer due 4/10/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018; Watson Laboratories, Inc. answer due 4/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/11/2018. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
Judge Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) assigned to case. (P,R) | ||
13 | 13 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4), transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (AKL) [Transferred from mnd on 1/17/2018.] | |
14 | 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:17-cv-05491. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |