New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine B Forrest
Case #: 1:18-mc-00025
CauseM 09-282 Attorney Change of Name
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2018
Terminated:Jan 19, 2018

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, January 19, 2018
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll Tue 01/23 9:57 AM
ORDER granting1 Application to Change Attorney Name on Roll... that Alison G. Renner previously admitted under the name of Alison L. Genova is now admitted to practice on the rolls of attorneys of the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/19/2018) (wb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 01/19 9:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (ma)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 01/19 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (ma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
2 2 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Thu 01/18 4:24 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed. (Genova, Alison)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Change Attorney Name on Roll Thu 01/18 4:20 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - APPLICATION to Change Attorney's Name on the rolls of attorneys of the Southern District of New York from Alison L. Genova to Alison G. Renner . (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 0208-14593139)Document filed by Alison L. Genova.(Genova, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Marriage License