New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:18-cv-00760
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2018
Terminated:Jun 20, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 17, 2018 5:18 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
ESTHER DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Counter Claimant
MICHAEL DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Counter Defendant
GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
SAMUEL DAVIT
Represented By
ALAN L. ZEGAS
contact info
Cross Claimant
CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Claimant
ESTHER DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Claimant
MICHAEL DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Claimant
IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Defendant
SAMUEL DAVIT
Represented By
ALAN L. ZEGAS
contact info
Cross Defendant
CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Defendant
ESTHER DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Defendant
MICHAEL DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Defendant
IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Defendant
IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Defendant
SAMUEL DAVIT
Represented By
ALAN L. ZEGAS
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Defendant
ESTHER DAVIT
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Defendant
CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C.
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Plaintiff
GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By
MICHAEL VANUNU
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
GENE Y. KANG
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C.
Terminated: 03/22/2018
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Counter Claimant
IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C.
Terminated: 03/22/2018
Represented By
STEVEN PONTELL
Verde, Steinberg & Pontell
contact info
Cross Defendant
PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & TEHRAPY CENTER, P.C.
Terminated: 05/18/2018
Cross Defendant
ALEXANDER DIMEO, D.C.
Terminated: 05/18/2018
Defendant
PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & TEHRAPY CENTER, P.C.
Terminated: 05/18/2018
Defendant
ALEXANDER DIMEO, D.C.
Terminated: 05/18/2018


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
44 44 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 06/20 9:12 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 06/20/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/19 4:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants Ironbound M.R.I., L.L.C., Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center, L.L.C., Michael Davit, Samuel Davit, and Esther Davit by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Order Tue 06/19 11:29 AM
TEXT ORDER - In light of the parties agreement to settle, the conference call set for 6/202018 has been ADJOURNED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/19/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/14 3:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants Ironbound M.R.I., L.L.C., Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center, L.L.C., Michael Davit, and Esther Davit by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
40 40 order Order Wed 06/06 4:47 PM
TEXT ORDER - The conference call set for 6/7/2018 has been RESCHEDULED 6/20/2018 at 12:00 PM. No further submissions are permitted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/6/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
39 39 misc Letter Tue 06/05 8:36 AM
Letter from Steven Pontell, Esq.. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2018
38 38 misc Letter Mon 06/04 5:49 PM
Letter from Michael Vanunu re36 Letter, 37 Order.(VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
37 37 order Order Mon 06/04 4:29 PM
TEXT ORDER - Counsel for Defendant is directed to electronically file its letter dated May 25, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/4/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2018
36 36 misc Letter Fri 06/01 12:40 PM
Letter from Michael Vanunu re33 Scheduling Order. (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 05/18 9:51 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal without prejudice of all claims against Defendants, ALEXANDER DIMEO, DC., and PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & THERAPY CENTER, P.C.; ALEXANDER DIMEO, DC and PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & THERAPY CENTER, P.C. terminated. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 05/18/2017. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/17 4:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants Alexander Dimeo, D.C. and Passaic Chiropractic & Therapy Center, P.C. by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
33 33 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/15 10:48 AM
LETTER ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/14/2018. (fp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
32 32 misc Letter Mon 05/14 2:22 PM
Letter from Michael Vanunu re30 Letter.(VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
31 31 misc Letter Wed 05/09 4:23 PM
Letter from Michael Vanunu re30 Letter.(VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
30 30 misc Letter Wed 05/09 2:05 PM
Letter from Steven Pontell, Esq.. (PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
29 29 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/01 2:07 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2018. Motions must be filed not later than 8/10/2018. etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/30/2018. (fp, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
28 28 answer Answer to Crossclaim Mon 04/30 3:46 PM
Ironbound MRI, Cliffside Park Imaging, Michael Davit and Esther Davit's ANSWER to Crossclaim by defendant Samuel Davit by CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C..(PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 05/02 8:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 4/30/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
27 27 order Order Thu 04/26 12:26 PM
TEXT ORDER - By no later than April 26, 2018, the parties are to submit their joint discovery plan. See ECF No. 11. The joint discovery plan should be sent directly to Chambers via email (JBC_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/26/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Tue 04/24 4:39 PM
Samuel Davit ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SAMUEL DAVIT.(ZEGAS, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/23 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL VANUNU on behalf of All Plaintiffs (VANUNU, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
24 24 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 04/19 11:32 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alexander Dimeo, D.C. and Passaic Chiropractic and Therapy Center, P.C. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
23 23 misc Request for Default Wed 04/18 4:39 PM
Request for Default by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. against Alexander Dimeo, D.C. and Passaic Chiropractic and Therapy Center, P.C..(MILLER, GREGORY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Cover Letter to Clerk of Court,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 13, 2018
qc QC - Updating Account Fri 04/13 8:47 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter20 submitted by Alan Zegas on 4/6/2018 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
22 22 notice Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case Thu 04/12 3:48 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA terminated. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
21 21 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/10 11:22 AM
CONSENT ORDER vacating default against defendant Samuel Davit, and extending time to respond to the Complaint w/in 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/10/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
20 20 misc Letter Fri 04/06 1:43 PM
Letter from Alan L. Zegas, Esq. with Consent Order. (ZEGAS, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 04/04 9:17 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to deft, Samuel Davit for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
19 19 misc Request for Default Mon 04/02 6:03 PM
Request for Default by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. against Samuel Davit.(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Gene Y. Kang,
Att: 2 Letter to Clerk of Court,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/28 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. ALEXANDER DIMEO, DC served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/28 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & TEHRAPY CENTER, P.C. served on 3/26/2018, answer due 4/16/2018. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/22 11:27 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between counsel for Plaintiffs Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, and GEICO Casualty Co. (collectively Plaintiffs), and counsel for Defendants Ironbound M.R.I. L.L.C. and Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center, L.L.C. (collectively Defendants), that all counterclaims asserted by Defendants against Plaintiffs in this action are dismissed, with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/22/18. (DD, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 03/20 10:17 AM
STIPULATION Dismissing Counterclaims asserted by Defendants Ironbound M.R.I., L.L.C. and Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center, L.L.C. by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
14 14 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/15 10:45 AM
ORDER permitting Max Gershenoff, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/15/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
13 13 misc Application/Petition Wed 03/14 2:06 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Max Gershenoff for by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Gene Y. Kang,
Att: 2 Certification of Max Gershenoff,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 09, 2018
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/09 9:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. MICHAEL DAVIT served on 2/21/2018, answer due 3/14/2018. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
11 11 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 03/05 10:29 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/5/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim Fri 03/02 10:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ALEXANDER DIMEO, DC, SAMUEL DAVIT, PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & TEHRAPY CENTER, P.C., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C., MICHAEL DAVIT, ESTHER DAVIT, IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C..(PONTELL, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Statement
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 02/28 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. ESTHER DAVIT served on 2/22/2018, answer due 4/23/2018., SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; GEICO INDEMNITY CO.; GEICO CASUALTY CO.; GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. ESTHER DAVIT served on 2/22/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. SAMUEL DAVIT served on 2/22/2018, answer due 3/15/2018. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/21 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/21 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
misc QC - Generic Message Mon 01/22 12:08 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard modifications in Clerk's Quality Control message on 01/19/2018 regarding Cause of Action and Jurisdiction. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/19 11:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLIFFSIDE PARK IMAGING & DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, L.L.C., ESTHER DAVIT, MICHAEL DAVIT, SAMUEL DAVIT, ALEXANDER DIMEO, DC, IRONBOUND M.R.I. L.L.C., PASSAIC CHIROPRACTIC & TEHRAPY CENTER, P.C. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Donato Marucci* (dam)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/19 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL CASA on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (CASA, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/19 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (KANG, GENE)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/19 11:35 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action modified from 18:1962 Racketeering (Rico) Act to 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act. Jurisdiction changed from Federal Question to Diversity . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/18 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (ROBERTELLI, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/18 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Davit, Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center, L.L.C., Esther Davit, Samuel Davit, Alexander Dimeo, DC, Ironbound M.R.I. L.L.C., Passaic Chiropractic & Therapy Center, P.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8406598) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO..(ROBERTELLI, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons and Rider,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/18 3:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
Related: [-]