Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela Pepper
Case #: 2:18-cv-00096
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause27:185 Enforcement of Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2018
Terminated:Mar 19, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 18, 2018 3:59 AM CDT
Defendant
American Orthodontics Corporation
Represented By
Donald A Daugherty, Jr
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Zachary R Willenbrink
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Curiel
Represented By
Michael D Leffel
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 19, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/19 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick Curiel. (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Mon 03/19 9:37 AM
Case Terminated (vkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
16 16 misc Declaration Wed 03/07 1:56 PM
DECLARATION of Georgios Petrochilos (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/07 1:54 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Patrick Curiel re13 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading . (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
14 14 misc Declaration Mon 03/05 11:30 AM
DECLARATION of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. in Support of Respondent's Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Daugherty, Donald)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Expedite Extension of Time Mon 03/05 11:29 AM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Orthodontics Corporation.(Daugherty, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time
Thursday, February 22, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 02/22 2:05 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/22/2018 re8 Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. On February 15, 2018, the plaintiff filed a notice that he was withdrawing his opposition to the defendant's motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading. Dkt. No. 12. The court GRANTS the now unopposed motion for an extension of time. Dkt. No. 8. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 6, 2018. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
12 12 notice Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal) Thu 02/15 8:43 AM
NOTICE by Patrick Curiel of Withdrawal of Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
11 11 misc Declaration Tue 02/13 2:05 PM
DECLARATION of Georgios Petrochilos (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/13 2:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Patrick Curiel re8 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading . (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
9 9 misc Declaration Mon 02/12 3:46 PM
DECLARATION of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Daugherty, Donald)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/12 3:45 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by American Orthodontics Corporation.(Daugherty, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for extension of time to file responsive pleading
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/12 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R Willenbrink on behalf of American Orthodontics Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Zachary R. Willenbrink (Willenbrink, Zachary)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A Daugherty, Jr on behalf of American Orthodontics Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. (Daugherty, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
5 5 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/09 8:08 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Curiel. (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/09 9:09 AM
Due non-consent, this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/26 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Curiel. American Orthodontics Corporation served on 1/23/2018. (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
3 3 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 01/22 10:08 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Patrick Curiel (Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Modification Mon 01/22 8:26 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The attached summons was not saved properly and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the summons instructions and refile it using the event Request for Issuance of Summons. Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] and the[LINK:summons instructions] for further guidance. (blr)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 01/22 11:52 AM
Summons Issued as to American Orthodontics Corporation. (blr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 01/19 10:55 AM
DECLARATION of Georgios Petrochilos(Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Share Purchase Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit First Partial Award,
Att: 3 Exhibit Final Award,
Att: 4 Exhibit Endorsement and Judment
1 1 cmp Petition - Civil Case Filing Fri 01/19 10:52 AM
PETITION to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award filed by Patrick Curiel. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2752349)(Leffel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 01/19 10:57 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
Related: [-]