Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12551

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:18-ap-50076
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2018
Terminated:Nov 21, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Extole, Inc.
Represented By
Extole, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
APP Winddown, LLC
Represented By
Stanley B. Tarr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 21, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/21 11:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-50076 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 15, 2018
11 11 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Thu 11/15 2:44 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Eighth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Related [+]. Signed on 11/15/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 11/14 5:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Eighth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by APP Winddown, LLC. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
9 9 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Tue 10/30 10:37 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 // Plaintiff's Eighth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by APP Winddown, LLC. Objections due by 11/13/2018. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/17 11:22 AM
Certificate of Service Regarding (1) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 18, 2018 at 10:30 A.M. (Eastern Time); and (2) Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by APP Winddown, LLC. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
7 7 9 pgs order Order Mon 04/16 3:01 PM
Order Establishing Streamline Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than Or Equal To $75,000.00 Brought By Plaintiff Signed on 4/16/2018 (SH)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 04/16 12:19 PM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by APP Winddown, LLC, APP Winddown, LLC, APP Winddown, LLC, APP Winddown, LLC, APP Winddown, LLC, APP Winddown, LLC, et al., APP Winddown, LLC, et al.. Hearing scheduled for 4/18/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 04/09 2:00 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by APP Winddown, LLC. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Thu 03/22 3:53 PM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by APP Winddown, LLC. (Guilfoyle, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 02/22 6:02 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Extole, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/23/2018. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Saturday, January 20, 2018
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 01/20 8:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 18-50076 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8726479, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 01/19 3:13 PM
Adversary case 18-50076 Complaint by APP Winddown, LLC against Extole, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/19/2018. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives