Boehm et al v. SportsMem, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 21, 2018 6:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gold Standard Authentics, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Real Deal Memorabilia, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Steiner Sports Memorabilia, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Signatures 4 U, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Schwartz Sports Memorabilia, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Sacks
|
|
Defendant
Charles Price
|
|
Defendant
Palm Beach Autographs, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Scott Mulham
|
|
Defendant
Main Line Autographs, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chris Lazarczyk
|
|
Defendant
Sean Jacoby
|
|
Defendant
Hollywood Collectibles, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ed Emmitt
|
|
Defendant
Dov Edillman
|
|
Defendant
EZ Graphs, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Keith Doyle
|
|
Defendant
Diamond Legends, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bell Sports Marketing, LLC
|
|
Defendant
SportsMem, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SportsMem, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Boehm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Spinelli
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Athlon Sports Communications, Inc.
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
176 | 176
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 07/18 9:59 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:175 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Signatures 4 U, LLC against Paul Spinelli, Scott Boehm. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated July 18, 2019, Plaintiffs' claims against Signatures must be and are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/18/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
175 | 175
8
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Thu 07/18 9:26 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' claims against Signatures must be and are DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 144 and because this Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves the last remaining claims in this action to close the case. SO ORDERED. re:144 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) . MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Signatures 4 U, LLC. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/18/2019) (rjm) |