Baptist Hospital, Inc., et al v. McKesson Corporation, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45073 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Northern, 3:17-cv-00816 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:04 PM EST |
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
MDL Notice Only
Jay Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Baptist Hospital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:50 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 67 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4030338.), filed by JAY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HOSPITAL INC. (DANIEL, JAMES) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.1(E), a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
3 | 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS recused. Case reassigned to SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON for all further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/22/2017. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DANIEL, JAMES) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 11/28/2017. (sdw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:5 Order of Recusal. (sdw) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1). Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/14/2017 Re: MDL No. 2804. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transferred to Judge Dan A. Polster, pursuant to MDL 2804 transfer order to OHIO/NORTHERN. (MB) [Transferred from flnd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern. Case number 3:17-cv-00816. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |