Marion County, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45075 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 2:17-cv-00202 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:04 PM EST |
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J. M. Smith Corp
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Marion County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:50 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3597489), filed by Marion County, Mississippi. (CS) [Transferred from mssd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 RICO Notice. (CS) [Transferred from mssd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Stay Case by Marion County, Mississippi(Fuller, Michael) [Transferred from mssd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A Transfer Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh B Not of Potential Tag-Along Actions, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C Schedule of Actions | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 1/22/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (LDR) [Transferred from mssd on 1/22/2018.] | |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 2:17-cv-00202. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |