County of Smith v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45081 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Texas Eastern, 6:17-cv-00699 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-100, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Smith
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Terminated: 03/23/2018
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
Terminated: 03/23/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:10 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by County of Smith. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rlf) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint7 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cardinal Health, Inc. to 2/17/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint8 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cardinal Health, Inc. to 3/5/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Allergan Finance LLC to 2/10/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Allergan Finance LLC to 2/26/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Watson Laboratories, Inc. to 2/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint12 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Actavis LLC to 2/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint13 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Actavis Pharma, Inc. to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint16 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. to 2/16/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint17 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint18 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for McKesson Corporation to 2/17/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint19 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for McKesson Corporation to 3/4/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint20 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. to 3/5/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint21 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 2/27/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
27 | 27
![]() |
|
28 | 28
![]() |
|
29 | 29
![]() |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint23 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Purdue Pharma Inc. to 2/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint24 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Purdue Pharma L.P. to 2/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint25 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Purdue Frederick Company to 2/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint27 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Purdue Pharma Inc. to 3/2/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint28 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Purdue Pharma L.P. to 3/2/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint29 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Purdue Frederick Company to 3/2/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint32 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint33 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint34 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint35 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Johnson & Johnson to 2/12/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
30 | 30
![]() |
|
31 | 31
![]() |
|
32 | 32
![]() |
|
33 | 33
![]() |
|
34 | 34
![]() |
|
35 | 35
![]() |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
![]() |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Ohio (MDL 2804). In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 1/23/2018.] | ||
37 | 37
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
![]() |