Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45088 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Tennessee Middle, 3:17-cv-01605 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
JM Smith Corporation d/b/a Smith Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Plaintiff
Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 9:01 PM EDT |
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark P. Chalos, Kenneth S. Byrd and John Tate Spragens. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elizabeth J. Cabraser and Bruce W. Leppla: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 1/12/2018. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2580505), filed by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee.(dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Summons issued as to all defendants. (dt) (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) Modified on 12/22/2017 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
TN State Bar status verified as active for Isaac T. Conner, and Andre Philip Johnson. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
CA State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth J. Cabraser, and Bruce W. Leppla. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
NY State Bar status verified as active for Steven E. Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral. (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Paulina do Amaral and Steven E. Fineman: WITHIN 21 DAYS,counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). (mg) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for attorney(s) Elizabeth J. Cabraser and Bruce W. Leppla to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2584347) by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) Modified on 1/4/2018 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing for Elizabeth J. Cabraser, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing for Bruce W. Leppla | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for attorney(s) Steven E. Fineman and Paulina do Amaral to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2584350) by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee.(Chalos, Mark) Modified on 1/4/2018 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing for Steven E. Fineman, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing for Paulina do Amaral | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting6 Motion for Elizabeth J. Cabraser and Bruce W. Leppla to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
9 | 9 ORDER granting7 Motion for Steven E. Fineman and Paulina do Amaral to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/8/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 1/9/2018. (Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
12 | 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County Tennessee. McKesson Corporation served on 1/9/2018. (Byrd, Kenneth) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 4) filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804, transferring case to the ND of Ohio. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
14 | 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) rec'd from the ND of Ohio. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; Proposed order submitted to chambers). (af) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-4) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2804, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/22/18. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 1/23/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:17-cv-01605. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |