New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referred: Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:18-cv-00538
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2018
Terminated:May 25, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 24, 2018 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By
John W. Egan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Samuel Sverdlov
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eugene Duncan
Represented By
Daniel C Cohen
Cohen & Mizrahi LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, May 25, 2018
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/25 10:29 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation at12 is so ordered. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l )(A)(ii), the action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 5/25/2018. (Taronji, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/23 1:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. (Egan, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 04/26 3:05 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Related Deadlines in Light of Settlement by Eugene Duncan. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 04/26 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Eugene Duncan (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 04/26 2:58 PM
ORDER The stipulation of discontinuance is due by May 28, 2018. (Counsel is reminded that any request for judicial action must be docketed into the ECF court file as a motion). Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/26/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 04/26 4:12 PM
ORDER granting11 . Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/26/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/29 3:52 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, up to and including April 30, 2018 by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Egan, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/29 5:21 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. Answer is now due 4/30/2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/29/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/21 11:17 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, up to and including March 30, 2018 by Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Egan, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Sverdlov, Samuel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Egan on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Egan, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/21 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. answer is due 3/30/2018. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/21/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/20 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene Duncan. Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. served on 2/7/2018, answer due 2/28/2018. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/26 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/26 11:07 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/26 11:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 11:06 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/25 7:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10147357 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Eugene Duncan. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons