City of Methuen v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45106 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 3:18-cv-10035 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:07 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Methuen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:54 PM EDT |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6954303 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by City of Methuen.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (Caruso, Stephanie) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Michael A. Ponsor assigned to case. (Healy, Bethaney) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Healy, Bethaney) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 5 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Number CTO-5 in MDL Case MDL 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on January 24, 2018. Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 1/25/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 3:18-cv-10035. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |