New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Referred: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Case #: 2:18-cv-00561
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2018
Terminated:Sep 28, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 25, 2018 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Beacon Health Partners, LLP
Represented By
Thomas S. D'Antonio
Ward Greenberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Beacon IPA, LLC
Represented By
Thomas S. D'Antonio
Ward Greenberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC
Represented By
Thomas S. D'Antonio
Ward Greenberg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP
Represented By
Eryn Y. Truong
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Ross Harrington
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Patrick McCormick
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Joseph N. Campolo
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Zwanger Radiology, P.C.
Represented By
Eryn Y. Truong
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Ross Harrington
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Patrick McCormick
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Joseph N. Campolo
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.
Represented By
Eryn Y. Truong
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Jonathan Ross Harrington
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Patrick McCormick
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, LLP
contact info
Joseph N. Campolo
Campolo, Middleton & Mccormick, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Albert Zilkha, M.D.
Represented By
Daniel James Vitelli
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Margaux Lynn Rosa Poueymirou
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Matthew L. Cantor
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zilkha Radiology, P.C.
Represented By
Daniel James Vitelli
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Margaux Lynn Rosa Poueymirou
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Matthew L. Cantor
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 28, 2018
43 43 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/28 10:23 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/28/2018. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
42 42 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/27 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 14, 2018
41 41 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/14 11:08 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/14 11:34 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court is adopting the amended schedule set forth in counsel's application. The parties are on notice that no further extensions of these deadlines will be granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/14/2018. (McCuiston, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 08/31 12:31 PM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court adopts the proposed extension dates in DE40 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/31/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
40 40 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 08/29 10:28 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
39 39 misc Transcript Tue 08/21 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 17, 2018, before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Transcriber AA Express Transcripts, Telephone number 888-456-9716. Email address: AAExpress@Court-Transcripts.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2018. (Kanellopoulos, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/08 2:41 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The dates proposed in DE38 for briefing of the motion to dismiss and for limited discovery are hereby adopted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/8/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
38 38 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 08/07 10:48 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Document Demands and Responses by Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
37 37 2 pgs minutes Initial Conference Hearing Order on Motion for Discovery Tue 07/17 5:35 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson: Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/17/2018. Briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss set. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for details. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/17 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eryn Y. Truong on behalf of Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Truong, Eryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
35 35 motion Discovery Mon 07/16 6:01 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery Plan and Case Schedule by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs motion Discovery Mon 07/16 5:30 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery Plan and Case Schedule by Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. (Vitelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A
33 33 misc Letter Mon 07/16 9:59 AM
Letter in response to Defendants' requests for pre-motion conference by Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, July 13, 2018
32 32 2 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 07/13 1:13 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 46 pgs Exhibit B
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Fri 07/13 4:07 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; granting32 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has received counsels' filings. The Court will take up the issue of Defendants' prospective motions to dismiss at the Initial Conference on July 17, 2018 at 10 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/13/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
31 31 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 07/12 5:21 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 07/06 4:05 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference before the undersigned will be held on July 17, 2018 at 10 a.m. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 7/6/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
30 30 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 07/05 1:29 PM
Letter From Matthew L. Cantor re: Amended Complaint by Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redlined Version of Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Amended Complaint
order Order(Other) Thu 07/05 11:48 AM
ORDER. The Court's June 18, 2018 order is hereby VACATED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15, defendants must respond to the Amended Complaint within 14 days of service. Any letters filed by defendants seeking a pre-motion conference for a proposed motion to dismiss (and any resulting motion) are respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/5/2018. (Terranova, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
29 29 1 pgs motion Adjourn Conference Mon 07/02 3:28 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on Consent by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
28 28 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/02 2:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC, Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc., filed by Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 29, 2018
order Scheduling Order Fri 06/29 9:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: the Court is advancing the Status Conference previously scheduled for July 27, 2018. The Status Conference will now proceed before the undersigned on July 12, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. At that time, this Court will address counsels' filings at DE25 -27 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/29/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
27 27 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 06/28 4:10 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs in response to Defendants letter by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
26 26 1 pgs misc Letter Wed 06/27 4:26 PM
Letter request for Clarification/Reconsideration by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
25 25 3 pgs misc Letter Wed 06/27 2:06 PM
Letter request for Clarification/Reconsideration by Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC (D'Antonio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/19 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaux Lynn Rosa Poueymirou on behalf of Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Poueymirou, Margaux)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Tue 06/19 11:58 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: in light of Judge Azrack's referral Order, this case is being set down for a Status Conference on July 27, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 910 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/19/2018. (Cento, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 06/18 8:57 AM
ORDER : The order entered on 6/12/2018 is hereby VACATED. The request for a pre-motion conference is denied. This case is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson to conduct an initial conference and oversee discovery.21 and22 are terminated. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/18/2018. (Posillico, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
order Order(Other) Tue 06/12 2:21 PM
ORDER: The pre-motion conference letters filed by defendants21 and22 , and any resulting motion, is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Tomlinson. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/12/2018. (Posillico, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
23 23 4 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/23 3:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim letter request, pursuant to Section IV(B) of Judge Azrack's Individual Rules ,22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
22 22 3 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 03/19 3:02 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
21 21 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/16 12:53 PM
First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim letter request, pursuant to Section IV(B) of Judge Azrack's Individual Rules by Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order to Answer Tue 03/06 8:49 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER re19 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the Summons and Complaint. Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C. and Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. answer due 3/19/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/5/2018. (Ryan, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 03/02 1:24 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the Summons and Complaint by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 5:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 5:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. Beacon IPA, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 4:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. Beacon Health Partners, LLP served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 4:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 4:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ross Harrington on behalf of Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Harrington, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick McCormick on behalf of Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (aty to be noticed) (McCormick, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Campolo on behalf of Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Campolo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/15 6:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. Zwanger Radiology, P.C. served on 2/9/2018, answer due 3/2/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/15 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP served on 2/8/2018, answer due 3/1/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/07 4:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. Zwanger-Pesiri Inc. served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 01/29 9:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Beacon Health Partners, LLP, Beacon IPA, LLC, CHS Physician Partners PO, LLC, Zwanger & Persiri Radiology Group, LLP, Zwanger Radiology, P.C., Zwanger-Pesiri Inc.. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/26 6:54 PM
Proposed Summons. by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 01/26 4:12 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 01/26 4:07 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
2 2 41 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/26 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C.. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
1 1 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/26 3:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albert Zilkha, MD, Zilkha Radiology, P.C. (Cantor, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 01/26 3:59 PM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. A defendant was missing from the case; defendant was added; document entry #1 was deleted and re-entered against all defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 01/26 3:59 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-10149687 (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 01/26 4:05 PM
Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/26 4:12 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
Related: [-]