Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gene Ek Pratter
Case #: 2:18-cv-00327
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2018
Terminated:Mar 24, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 24, 2018 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
EAST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
Represented By
SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Siana Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
CAROLYN NAYLOR FLYNN
Siana, Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TED LEWIS
Represented By
SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Siana Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
CAROLYN NAYLOR FLYNN
Siana, Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JAMES RENEGAR
Represented By
SHERYL LYNN BROWN
Siana Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
CAROLYN NAYLOR FLYNN
Siana, Bellwoar & Mcandrew, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MARY BUSH
address redacted

GPO Jul 16 2018
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SETTING FORTH THE REASONS WHY THE COURT IS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 8). PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY AUGUST 31, 2018. AN APPROPRIATE ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/13/18. 7/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, )
GPO Jul 16 2018
ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DOCKET NO. 8) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN AN ATTEMPT TO CURE THE PLEADING DEFICIENCIES CONSISTENT WITH THIS COURT'S ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM BY AUGUST 31, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/13/18. 7/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, )
GPO Sep 09 2020
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/8/2020. 9/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
GPO Sep 09 2020
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/8/2020. 9/9/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 16, 2023
112 112 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 01/16 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of TED LEWIS, JAMES RENEGAR(Murray, D. Addison)
Related: [-]