Original Case: 3:12-cv-00454

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-17009
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2013
Terminated:Sep 08, 2014
Last checked: Friday Sep 04, 2015 5:42 PM PDT
Defendant
CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant - Appellant
PRENTICE EARL SANDERS
Represented By
Joanne Hoeper
Joanne Hoeper
contact info
Joshua Seth White
City Attorney's Office
contact info
Peter Julian Keith
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Elizabeth Pederson
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARAMAD CONLEY
Represented By
Rebekah Punak
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Eric H. MacMichael
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Daniel Edward Purcell
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/04/2015 5:19 PM PDT
Friday, October 04, 2013
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants City and County of San Francisco and Prentice Earl Sanders on 10/04/2013. Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/11/2013. Transcript ordered by 11/04/2013. Transcript due 12/03/2013. Appellants City and County of San Francisco and Prentice Earl Sanders opening brief due 01/13/2014. Appellee Caramad Conley answering brief due 02/11/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8810472] (IV) [Entered: 10/04/2013 04:16 PM]
Related: [-]