Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-22176

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Michelle M Harner
Case #: 1:18-ap-00024
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
MOMA FUNDING LLC
3201 Marina Way
National City, CA 91950
Represented By
MOMA FUNDING LLC
contact info
Defendant
QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC
12006 98th Ave NE No. 200
Kirkland, WA 98034
Represented By
QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Jean Wadsworth
1738 Whitfield Court
Crofton, MD 21114
Represented By
Michael Patrick Coyle
The Coyle Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, May 07, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/07 3:04 PM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-24 Closed. (Harper, Vicky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
court ADI process Return Mail Thu 04/26 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 04/12/2018 a notice RE: Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding TO MOMA FUNDING LLC 3201 Marina Way National City, CA 91950-6301. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/13 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, April 09, 2018
11 11 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/09 6:00 PM
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (Harper, Vicky)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant MOMA FUNDING LLC, Defendant QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC
Sunday, April 01, 2018
court ADI process Return Mail Sun 04/01 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 03/18/2018 a notice RE: TO MOMA FUNDING LLC 3201 Marina Way National City, CA 91950-6301. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/19 3:13 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim) Filed by MOMA FUNDING LLC, QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC. (Canter, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, March 18, 2018
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/19 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, March 16, 2018
8 8 court Returned Mail Notice to Party Fri 03/16 12:07 PM
Notice of returned mail to a party, MOMA FUNDING LLC (dft), in this case. (admin)
Related: [-]
court ADI process Return Mail Fri 03/16 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 02/28/2018 a notice RE: Order on Motion to Extend Time TO MOMA FUNDING LLC 3201 Marina Way National City, CA 91950-6301. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/01 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, February 26, 2018
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 02/26 5:32 PM
Order Granting Consent Motion For Enlargement Of Time To File Responsive Pleading To Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due (10) days after entry of Order on Motion to Dismiss in Adv. Pro. No. 17-00380 Pre-trial Postponed. Related [+]. (Harper, Vicky) Modified on 2/26/2018 (Harper, Vicky)
Related: [-] 5 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Postpone the March 22, 2018 Pretrial Conference filed by Defendant MOMA FUNDING LLC, Defendant QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
5 5 motion Extend Time Tue 02/20 12:44 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Postpone the March 22, 2018 Pretrial Conference Filed by MOMA FUNDING LLC, QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC. (Canter, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/20 12:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by MOMA FUNDING LLC, QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC. (Canter, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/02 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 01/30 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on MOMA FUNDING LLC Date Issued 1/30/2018, Answer Due 3/1/2018; QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC Date Issued 1/30/2018, Answer Due 3/1/2018 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/22/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 9-C, Baltimore - Judge Harner. (Harper, Vicky)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda Jean Wadsworth
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/30 6:29 AM
Adversary case 18-00024 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Michael Patrick Coyle on behalf of Linda Jean Wadsworth against MOMA FUNDING LLC, QUANTUM3 GROUP LLC. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Coyle, Michael)
Related: [-]