Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc Thomas Treadwell
Case #: 5:18-cv-00039
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2018
Terminated:Jul 18, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jul 29, 2018 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
BOLA SOGADE MD LLC
Represented By
TARYN HAUMANN
contact info
ADAM L APPEL
Dermer Appel Ruder LLC
contact info
Defendant
DR BOLA SOGADE
Represented By
TARYN HAUMANN
contact info
ADAM L APPEL
Dermer Appel Ruder LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHEILA L LAFORTUNE
Represented By
REGINA S MOLDEN
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
15 15 order Judgment Wed 07/18 11:39 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing case. (ans)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/17 1:38 PM
SETTLEMENT ORDER . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 7/17/2018. (tlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
13 13 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/17 2:58 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed through 6/18/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 4/17/2018. (tlh)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stay Tue 04/17 12:39 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation by SHEILA L LAFORTUNE filed by REGINA S MOLDEN.(MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 04/10 11:15 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document must be refiled to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (ans)
Related: [-] 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BOLA SOGADE, BOLA SOGADE MD LLC
Monday, April 09, 2018
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/09 5:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE (APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/04 4:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE.(APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/08 4:50 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Response to the complaint due by 4/4/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 3/8/2018. (mmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/05 12:24 PM
SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE filed by ADAM L APPEL.(APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 03/05 12:08 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Document must be refiled using Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (ans)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by BOLA SOGADE, BOLA SOGADE MD LLC
Friday, March 02, 2018
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 03/02 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE (APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 03/02 2:31 PM
STIPULATION of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE (HAUMANN, TARYN)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 02/26 9:57 AM
STIPULATION of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by BOLA SOGADE MD LLC, BOLA SOGADE (APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/26 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ADAM L APPEL on behalf of All Defendants Attorney ADAM L APPEL added to party BOLA SOGADE MD LLC(pty:dft), Attorney ADAM L APPEL added to party BOLA SOGADE(pty:dft) (APPEL, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
3 3 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Wed 01/31 11:08 AM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to SHEILA L LAFORTUNE (ans)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 01/31 10:59 AM
Summons Issued as to BOLA SOGADE and BOLA SOGADE MD LLC.(ans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons BOLA SOGADE, MD, LLC d/b/a OBGYNE CONSULTANTS
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
1 1 misc Complaint Tue 01/30 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against BOLA SOGADE, M.D., LLC, BOLA SOGADE Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2796460, $400 filed by SHEILA L LAFORTUNE(MOLDEN, REGINA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Civil Summons for Obgyne Consultants,
Att: 3 Summons Civil Summons for Dr. Bola Sogade