Board of Commissioners of the County of Allen v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45121 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Northern, 1:18-cv-00003 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:08 PM EST |
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miami Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
RiteAid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Commissioners of the County of Allen
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perry Fine
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Fishman
Terminated: 05/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:07 PM EDT |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3450499.), filed by The Board of Commissioners of the County of Allen.(Burns, Sarah) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Flow Chart, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 There were 0 summons/waiver of service submitted. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Proposed Summons filed by Board of Commissioners of The County of Allen The.(Burns, Sarah) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc and Lynn Webster. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs OPINION AND ORDER: For reasons stated in the order, the court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint properly identifying the citizenship of Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, and Lynn Webster, and the amount in controversy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 01/17/2018. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 UNCERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5), transferring case to MDL No 2804 in the Northern District of Ohio, before Judge Dan A Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 1/24/2018. (lns) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
7 | 7 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5), transferring case to MDL #2804 in the Northern District of Ohio, before Judge Dan A Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 1/24/2018. (lns) [Transferred from innd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Northern. Case number 1:18-cv-00003. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |