CITY OF TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA v. CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45129 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Southern, 2:18-cv-00011 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City Of Terre Haute, Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:36 PM EDT |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CITY OF TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4698489)(Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chou-il Lee on behalf of Plaintiff CITY OF TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (Lee, Chou-il) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of Plaintiff CITY OF TERRE HAUTE, INDIANA. (Herceg, Manuel) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (RSF) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CLOSED TRANSFER - to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL - 2804 PER CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #5. (CKM) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, IN RE: MDL - 2804 PER CTO #5 on 1/24/2018 (CKM) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00011. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |