JENNINGS COUNTY v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45131 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Southern, 4:18-cv-00006 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 5:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. f/k/a Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jennings County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:18 PM EDT |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JENNINGS COUNTY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4698640)(Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Shevitz on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin B. Levin on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Levin, Irwin) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff S. Gibson on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Gibson, Jeff) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess Allen Miller on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Miller, Vess) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Toops on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Toops, Lynn) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Andrew Knoll on behalf of Plaintiff JENNINGS COUNTY. (Knoll, Jonathan) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PURDUE PHARMA INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, LTD., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
9 | 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL - 2804 PER CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #5.(CKM) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, IN RE: MDL - 2804 PER CTO #5 on 1/24/2018. (CKM) [Transferred from insd on 1/30/2018.] | |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-00006. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |