Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:18-cv-00183
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 31, 2018 2:05 AM PDT
Petitioner
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Burke W. Kappler
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Respondent
Courtesy Call, Inc
Represented By
Robert G. Bernhoft
The Bernhoft Law Firm S.C.
contact info
Jonathan J. Hansen
Cooper Levenson, P.A.
contact info
Daniel J. Treduen
The Bernhoft Law Firm, S.C.
contact info
Respondent
Donor Relations, LLC
Represented By
Robert G. Bernhoft
The Bernhoft Law Firm S.C.
contact info
Jonathan J. Hansen
Cooper Levenson, P.A.
contact info
Daniel J. Treduen
The Bernhoft Law Firm, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
21 21 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Tue 08/06 11:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:18-cv-00183-GMN-DJA . (no image attached) (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
20 20 3 pgs notice Notice Other Tue 09/25 2:06 PM
NOTICE re: 19 MINUTE ORDER; filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Kappler, Burke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
19 19 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Enforce Wed 09/12 1:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/12/2018. On August 31, 2018, the Court held a Show Cause Hearing (ECF No. 18), at which time the parties notified the Court of a pending grand jury investigation against Richard Zeitlin, the owner and operator of Defendants' businesses. The FTC stated that the grand jury investigation has impacted their ability to request necessary documents related to this case. The Court accordingly ordered the FTC to file a Notice, or the parties to collectively file a joint status report, no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, October 1, 2018, that will inform the Court of how this case will stay on track. In light of the pending grand jury investigation, however, the Court finds it necessary to administratively close this case until the FTC decides how it will proceed with its investigation. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until the FTC notifies the Court that it is actively continuing its investigation of Defendants, at which time the Court will reopen the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report, or, in the alternative, the FTC file a Notice no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, October 1, 2018, that will inform the Court of the status of this case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
18 18 minutes Status Conference Show Cause Hearing Fri 08/31 9:29 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 8/31/2018 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Aaron Blazevich ; Pla Counsel (Appearing Telephonically): Burke Kappler, Ken Abbe, Faye Barnouw, and Leslie Melman ; Def Counsel (Appearing Telephonically): Robert Bernhoft, Daniel Treuden, and C. Jameson Beuerman ; Def Counsel (Appearing in Person): Joel Hansen on behalf of Jonathan Hansen ; Time of Hearing: 8:36 a.m. - 8:50 a.m. ; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Araceli Bareng ; Courtroom: 7D ; The Court convenes with all counsel appearing telephonically except Mr. Hansen, who appeared in person. Mr. Kappler provides the Court with the status of these proceedings. Mr. Kappler states that a pending grand jury investigation is proceeding simultaneously to this proceeding. Mr. Bernhoft responds. The Court orders the parties to file either a Notice by the FTC or a joint status report no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, October 1, 2018. The parties may inform the Court in the notice or joint status report whether or not another hearing would be helpful to the parties in this case and to ensure the case stays on track. The Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
17 17 minord Minute Order Thu 08/16 8:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/16/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. On February 20, 2018, the Court held a Show Cause Hearing (ECF No. 16), at which time the Court ordered the respondent to disclose documents and file a certificate of compliance no later than March 22, 2018. To date, nothing additional has been filed in this case. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Show Cause Hearing on Friday, August 31, 2018, at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Navarro. The filing of a certificate of compliance, dismissal documents, or a joint status report prior to Thursday, August 30, 2018, by 4:00 p.m. will automatically vacate this hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
16 16 minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 02/22 2:04 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 2/20/2018 before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Crtrm Administrator: Aaron Blazevich ; Pla Counsel: Burke Kappler ; Def Counsel: Jonathan Hansen (Appearing in Person) and Robert Bernhoft (Appearing Telephonically) ; Court Reporter: Araceli Bareng ; Recording start and end times: 2:09 p.m. - 2:33 p.m. ; Courtroom: 7C ; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from counsel. Mr. Kappler requests the Respondent have 10 days to comply with the Civil Investigative Disclosures. Mr. Bernhoft requests 30 days. The Court orders the Respondent to comply with disclosure of as many documents as possible by March 2, 2018. All remaining documents due no later than March 22, 2018. Mr. Kappler requests the Respondent file a certificate of compliance with privilege logs. Mr. Bernhoft objects. The Court orders the respondent to provide a certificate of compliance with the remaining documents on March 22, 2018. The Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Modified to correct date of hearing on 2/22/2018. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/20 8:29 AM
ORDER Granting6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert G. Bernhoft and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jonathan J. Hansen. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/16/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/16 1:50 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/16/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
13 13 7 pgs respm Reply Thu 02/15 3:25 PM
REPLY to Response to8 Motion to Dismiss, by Respondents Courtesy Call, Inc, Donor Relations, LLC. (Bernhoft, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
12 12 respm Response Tue 02/13 1:58 PM
RESPONSE to8 Motion to Dismiss, by Petitioner Federal Trade Commission. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Kappler, Burke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2018
11 11 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 3:59 PM
ORDER Granting5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel J. Treduen for Courtesy Call and Donor Relations, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/9/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
10 10 minord Minute Order Thu 02/08 2:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/8/2018. In light of the Show Cause Hearing set for February 20, 2018, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing schedule on the 8 Motion to Dismiss is expedited. Responses will now be due by 5:00 P.M. on Tuesday, February 13, 2018. Replies will be due by 5:00 P.M. on Thursday, February 15, 2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
9 9 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 02/07 1:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Courtesy Call, Inc, Donor Relations, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bernhoft, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 6 pgs motion Motion Dismiss Wed 02/07 1:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Motion to Enforce by Respondents Courtesy Call, Inc, Donor Relations, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2018. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/24/2018. (Bernhoft, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
7 7 notice Notice Other Tue 02/06 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service re3 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Kappler, Burke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, February 05, 2018
6 6 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 02/05 3:40 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert G. Bernhoft and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan J. Hansen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4957290) by Respondents Courtesy Call, Inc, Donor Relations, LLC. (Hansen, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
5 5 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 02/05 3:38 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Treduen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jonathan J. Hansen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4957272) by Respondents Courtesy Call, Inc, Donor Relations, LLC. (Hansen, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, February 02, 2018
4 4 minord Minute Order Fri 02/02 10:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/2/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Fri 02/02 10:09 AM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/1/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Motion Order to Show Cause Thu 02/01 2:06 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 2/15/2018. (ADR)
Related: [-]
1 1 119 pgs motion Motion Enforce Thu 02/01 2:05 PM
PETITION to Enforce Civil Investigative Demands by Petitioner Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 2/15/2018. (ADR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Memorandum,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Envelope