Maravi Moore v. Hank Whitman, et al
Original Case: 4:17-cv-00538
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cr-20069 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 27, 2018 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
HANK WHITMAN, In his official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREGG ABBOTT, in his official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LISA MCCARTNEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES MARK COOPER, In his official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KYLE JANEK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LUTHERAN SOCIAL SERVICES OF THE SOUTH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KATIE FLYNN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMY HOOD, In her official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PRENTISS HOOD, In his official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMY ZACHEMEYER, In her official and individual capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES SMITH, In his official and individual capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LUTHERAN SOCIAL SERVICES OF THE SOUTH, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARAVI MOORE, as next friend EH, the sibling of AH, as next friend ALH
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 26 2018
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [18-20069 Affirmed] Judge: WED, Judge: GJC, Judge: KDE. Mandate issue date is 08/17/2018 [18-20069] |
Docket last updated: 07/27/2018 3:30 AM CDT |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maravi Moore 18-20069 (AS) |