Bishop v. Amazon.Com, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00973 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 03, 2018 5:22 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Cedric Bishop
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Amazon.Com, Inc.
Terminated: 05/08/2018
1200 12th Avenue South Suite 1200
Seattle, WA 98144 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 05/08 10:35 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(A)(II): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and their respective counsel that Plaintiff CEDRIC BISHOP hereby voluntarily dismisses, with prejudice, his complaint against Defendant AMAZON.COM, INC. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with the parties to bear responsibility for their respective fees and costs. (Amazon.Com, Inc. terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/7/2018) (jwh) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/03 3:17 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Amazon.Com, Inc. and parties to bear responsibility for their respective costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/02 10:45 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. The conference is adjourned to May 31, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 5/28/2018 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/1/2018) (cf) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/02 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (cf) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/25 4:47 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint from April 28, 2018, to May 28, 2018 and for an adjournment of the Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John M. Magliery dated April 25, 2018. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 03/28 10:33 AM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is granted. Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 4/28/2018 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/28/2018) (cf) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 03/27 5:13 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John M. Magliery dated March 27, 2018. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 02/28 9:55 AM
ORDER: granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is Granted. SO ORDERED. Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 3/29/2018. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/28/2018) (ama) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/26 12:47 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John M. Magliery dated 2/26/2018. Document filed by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Magliery, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/20 11:02 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. Service was accepted by DONNA SNOW, CUSTOMER SERVICE. Document filed by Cedric Bishop. (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 02/06 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/6/2018) (ap) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/05 12:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (sj) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 02/05 12:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 02/05 12:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (sj) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 02/05 12:41 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj) |
||
Sunday, February 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Sun 02/04 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc.. Document filed by Cedric Bishop.(Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sun 02/04 2:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.Com, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cedric Bishop. (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 02/04 2:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 02/04 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14658995)Document filed by Cedric Bishop.(Mizrahi, Joseph) |